Lally Farms, Inc. v. Dole Berry Company
Plaintiff: Lally Farms, Inc.
Defendant: Dole Berry Company
Case Number: 8:2018cv01916
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Marian Yello on behalf of Dole Berry Company (Yello, Natalie)
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor B. Arnold on behalf of Dole Berry Company (Arnold, Trevor)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Dole Berry Company. (Arnold, Trevor)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 08/21/2018 by Lally Farms, Inc. as to Dole Berry Company. (James, Jack)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Dole Berry Company. (Arnold, Trevor)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dole Berry Company. Related case(s): Yes (Arnold, Trevor)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #7 Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Defendant shall have up to and including September 25, 2018 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/24/2018. (GMD)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 TERMINATED. PROOF of service by Lally Farms, Inc. (James, Jack) NOTE: Incorrect event code; counsel notified to re-file selecting: Civil Events - Initial Pleadings and Service - Service of Process - Summons returned executed. Modified on 9/25/2018 (LD).
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Dole Berry Company. (Arnold, Trevor)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lally Farms, Inc.. Related case(s): no (James, Jack)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/22/2018. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/8/2018. (KTT) (KTT). (KTT).
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/22/2018. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/8/2018. (KTT)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Lally Farms, Inc.. (LD)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Dole Berry Company. (LD)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dole Berry Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA052241) filed by Lally Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(LD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lally Farms, Inc. v. Dole Berry Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dole Berry Company
Represented By: Trevor B. Arnold
Represented By: Natalie Marian Yello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lally Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Pettus James, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?