Downtown Discount Produce, Inc. v. CRG Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Downtown Discount Produce, Inc.
Defendant: James Lanza, Jeff Gigante and CRG Management, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv01955
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
County: Brevard
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
2 Judge: Steven D Merryday
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/21/2018. (CCB)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon consideration of #17 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions/deadlines and to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/21/2018. (CCB)
September 20, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Downtown Discount Produce, Inc. (Barmat, Marc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Judge William F. Jung. New case number: 8:18-cv-1955-T-02SPF. Judge Steven D. Merryday no longer assigned to the case. (AG)
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of service by Downtown Discount Produce, Inc. re #14 Memorandum in support . (Barmat, Marc)
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in support re #13 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Downtown Discount Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff and Exhibits 1 through 3, #2 Ex. 4 - Statements of Account, #3 Declaration of Counsel and Exhibit 5, #4 Declaration of Counsel and Exhibit 6)(Barmat, Marc)
September 12, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for default judgment against CRG Management, LLC, Jeff Gigante, James Lanza by Downtown Discount Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barmat, Marc)
September 6, 2018 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to James Lanza. (DG)
September 6, 2018 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jeff Gigante. (DG)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CRG Management, LLC. (DG)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against All Defendants by Downtown Discount Produce, Inc.. (Barmat, Marc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 PROOF of service by Downtown Discount Produce, Inc. (Barmat, Marc) Modified on 9/6/2018
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/13/2018. (GSO)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Downtown Discount Produce, Inc.. (Barmat, Marc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to James Lanza. (DG)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Jeff Gigante. (DG)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to CRG Management, LLC. (DG)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CRG Management, LLC, Jeff Gigante, James Lanza (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA-052324) filed by Downtown Discount Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(DG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downtown Discount Produce, Inc. v. CRG Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Gigante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRG Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Downtown Discount Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Marc P. Barmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?