Hyperponic LLC. v. Carroll

Plaintiff: Hyperponic LLC.
Defendant: Richard C. Carroll
Case Number: 8:2018cv01992
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Pinellas
0 Judge: James S Moody
1 Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2018 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Amended Complaint by Richard C. Carroll.(Furlong, Christopher)
September 20, 2018 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint , ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by Richard C. Carroll.(Furlong, Christopher)
August 27, 2018 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Hyperponic LLC.. Related case(s): no (Verona, Jay)
August 27, 2018 5 RETURN of service executed on 08/17/2018 by Hyperponic LLC. as to Richard C. Carroll. (Verona, Jay)
August 15, 2018 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages, Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Richard C. Carroll filed by Hyperponic LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Verona, Jay)
August 15, 2018 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 8/15/2018. (AD)
August 13, 2018 2 SUMMONS issued as to Richard C Carroll. (EA)
August 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Richard C Carroll (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA052412) filed by Hyperponic LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(EA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyperponic LLC. v. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Carroll
Represented By: Christopher Sean Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyperponic LLC.
Represented By: Jay Barry Verona
Represented By: Mindi M. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?