New Beginnings for US 2016, LLC v. Rando

Plaintiff: New Beginnings for US 2016, LLC
Defendant: John R. Rando
Case Number: 8:2018cv02040
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff New Beginnings for US 2016, LLC filed this case on August 17, 2018. (Doc. #1 ). Based on the Court's review of the docket, it appears that service of process has not yet been effected on Defendant John R. Rando. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to file a status report by October 17, 2018, regarding its efforts to effect service of process. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/10/2018. (DMD)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to John R. Rando. (KMM)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details.(TWL)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/22/2018. (TWL)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John R. Rando (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA052568) filed by New Beginnings for US 2016, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Beginnings for US 2016, LLC v. Rando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Rando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Beginnings for US 2016, LLC
Represented By: Leon Francisco Hirzel, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?