NJH et al v. 2 Infinity Florida LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lyana T. Colon Garcia, NJH and Julio C. Hidalgo
Defendant: John Doe, Richard Roe, Rich Cook, 2 Infinity Florida LLC and XYZ Insurance Companies
Case Number: 8:2018cv02093
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #8 Amended Complaint by 2 Infinity Florida LLC.(Buckley, Martin) Modified text on 10/11/2018 (LNR).
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #8 Amended Complaint by 2 Infinity Florida LLC. (Buckley, Martin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Claim by Rich Cook. (Buckley, Martin)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE REGARDING SUMMONS returned executed #9 by Lyana T. Colon Garcia, Julio C. Hidalgo, NJH (O'Connor, John) Modified text on 10/3/2018 (JNB).
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Lyana T. Colon Garcia, Julio C. Hidalgo, NJH (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(O'Connor, John) Modified text on 10/3/2018 (JNB).
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Against All Defendants against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(O'Connor, John)
August 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 8/24/2018. (SRC)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 07/15/2008. (EA)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to 2 Infinity Florida LLC (Tallahassee, FL). (EA)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to 2 Infinity Florida LLC (Lakeland, FL). (EA)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Rich Cook. (EA)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to 2 Infinity Florida LLC (Birmingham, AL). (EA)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA052648) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(EA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NJH et al v. 2 Infinity Florida LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyana T. Colon Garcia
Represented By: John Raymond O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NJH
Represented By: John Raymond O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio C. Hidalgo
Represented By: John Raymond O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Cook
Represented By: Martin Thomas Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 Infinity Florida LLC
Represented By: Martin Thomas Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?