Shallenburg et al v. PNC Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Deborah M. Shallenburg and Michael P. Shallenburg
Defendant: James E. Albertelli, P.A. and PNC Bank Financial Services Group, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02225
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
1 Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice by Deborah M. Shallenburg, Michael P. Shallenburg. (Swift, Aaron) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 2, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Deborah M. Shallenburg, Michael P. Shallenburg. (Isringhaus, Jordan)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/6/2020, Dispositive motions due by 4/10/2020, Pretrial statement due by 7/21/2020, All other motions due by 7/28/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 1:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 9/8/2020 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/6/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/30/2018. (BGS)
October 23, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice by PNC Bank Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Ridout, Wesley)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time until October 26 2018, to File Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/23/2018. (Wilson, Thomas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Isringhaus, Jordan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by James E. Albertelli, P.A.. (Vesely, Brandon)
October 19, 2018 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by PNC Bank Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Ridout, Wesley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant James E. Albertelli, P.A., shall respond to the complaint on or before October 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/8/2018. (CEH)
October 5, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by James E. Albertelli, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vesely, Brandon)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before October 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/5/2018. (CEH)
October 4, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by PNC Bank Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Ridout, Wesley)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/1/2018. (Wilson, Thomas)
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference by Deborah M. Shallenburg, Michael P. Shallenburg. (Isringhaus, Jordan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 26, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order for civil cases by PNC Bank Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Ridout, Wesley)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Deborah M. Shallenburg, Michael P. Shallenburg. Related case(s): no (Isringhaus, Jordan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Deborah M. Shallenburg, Michael P. Shallenburg. (Isringhaus, Jordan)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rules 3.01(a) and 3.01(g) #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/17/2018. (DMS)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Defendant, James E. Albertelli, P.A.'s Motion to Stay Discovery; denying without prejudice #4 Defendant, James E. Albertelli, P.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice. Defendant James E. Albertelli, P.A.'s motions are denied without prejudice as they were filed while this case was pending in state court. As such, the motions do not refer to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or comply with the Local Rules of this court. See Local Rule 3.01. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/13/2018. (BGS)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/26/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/12/2018. (BGS)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/26/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/12/2018. (BGS)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by PNC Bank Financial Services Group, Inc.. Filed in state court 8/28/2018. (CTR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Deborah M. Shallenburg, Michael P. Shallenburg. Filed in state court 8/28/2018.(CTR)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to stay discovery filed by Deborah M. Shallenburg, Michael P. Shallenburg. Filed in state court 8/28/2018. (CTR)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by James E. Albertelli, P.A.. Filed in state court 8/20/2018. (CTR)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to stay discovery by James E. Albertelli, P.A.. Filed in state court 8/17/2018. (CTR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against PNC Bank, N.A. and James E. Albertelli, P.A with Jury Demand filed by Michael P. Shallenburg, Deborah M. Shallenburg. Filed in state court 7/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-N)(CTR)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 6th Judicial Circuit in and for Pinellas County, Florida, case number 18-4809-CI filed in State Court on 7/20/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA052931 filed by PNC Bank Financial Services Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Records, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shallenburg et al v. PNC Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Albertelli, P.A.
Represented By: Joshua David Knight
Represented By: Brandon S. Vesely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Mark New, II
Represented By: Wesley Lawrence Ridout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah M. Shallenburg
Represented By: Jordan Tyler Isringhaus
Represented By: Aaron M. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Shallenburg
Represented By: Jordan Tyler Isringhaus
Represented By: Aaron M. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?