Philpot v. Metal Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Metal Systems, Inc and Metal Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02400
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 10/19/2018 by Larry G. Philpot as to Metal Systems, Inc.. (Parwani, Rinky) ***Corrected date service was executed based 11/13/2018 (LSS).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 11/9/2018. (SMB)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Metal Systems, Inc.. (Zagrebelsky, Alla)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alla Zagrebelsky on behalf of Metal Systems, Inc. (Zagrebelsky, Alla)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 10/1/2018. (AD)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (EA)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Metal Systems, Inc. (EA)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Larry G. Philpot. (EA)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metal Systems, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA053364) filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(EA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Metal Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Rinky S. Parwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metal Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metal Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Alla Zagrebelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?