Jimenez v. Nesco Resource, LLC
Plaintiff: Anais Jimenez
Defendant: Nesco Resource, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv02401
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Brian J. Kelly, appearing on behalf of Nesco Resource, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA54248.) Related document: #13 Unopposed MOTION for Brian J. Kelly to appear pro hac vice. (LNR)
November 20, 2018 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Leach, Carlos)
November 19, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #18 Amended Complaint by Nesco Resource, LLC.(Mooney, Nichole)
November 19, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nesco Resource, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Anais Jimenez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Right to Sue letter)(Leach, Carlos)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Brian Kelly may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/16/2018. (BEE)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 --motion for leave to amend the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/16/2018. (BK)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nesco Resource, LLC. Related case(s): no (Mooney, Nichole)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Order by Nesco Resource, LLC. (Mooney, Nichole)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Brian J. Kelly to appear pro hac vice by Nesco Resource, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mooney, Nichole) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file to File Amended Complaint by Anais Jimenez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint with Exhibits)(Leach, Carlos)
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Nesco Resource, LLC.(Mooney, Nichole)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Response due by 11/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 10/31/2018. (BEE)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Nesco Resource, LLC. (Mooney, Nichole) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nichole M. Mooney on behalf of Nesco Resource, LLC (Mooney, Nichole)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Anais Jimenez. Related case(s): no (Leach, Carlos)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Anais Jimenez. (Leach, Carlos)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/2/2018. (GSO)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of consent to join by Anais Jimenez . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signed Consent - Jimenez)(Leach, Carlos)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Nesco Resource, LLC. (EA)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nesco Resource, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA053365) filed by Anais Jimenez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(EA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Nesco Resource, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anais Jimenez
Represented By: Carlos V. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nesco Resource, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Kelly
Represented By: Nichole M. Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?