Danna v. Compass One, LLC
Plaintiff: Margaret Danna
Defendant: Compass One, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv02440
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 --motion for approval of settlement; dismissing the action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/19/2018. (BK)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejduice by Compass One, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Siegel, Steven)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Margaret Danna. Related case(s): yes (Fenton, Matthew)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Compass One, LLC. Related case(s): no (Siegel, Steven)
October 8, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint by Compass One, LLC.(Siegel, Steven)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/4/2018. (GSO)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Compass One, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Margaret Danna. Filed in state court 8/31/2018.(CTR)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 6th Judicial Circuit in and for Pinellas County, Florida, case number 18-5765-CI filed in State Court on 8/31/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA053451 filed by Compass One, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danna v. Compass One, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Danna
Represented By: Matthew K. Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass One, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?