Caldwell v. Dodge Chrysler Group et al

Plaintiff: Keith R. Caldwell
Defendant: Sergio Marchionne, U.S. Attorney General, Dodge Chrysler Group, U.S. Department of Transportation and U.S. Attorney's Office
Case Number: 8:2018cv02525
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 ALIAS SUMMONS issued as to Dodge Chrysler Group, Sergio Marchionne. (LD)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Keith R. Caldwell as to Dodge Chrysler Group, Sergio Marchionne. (LD)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/2/2018. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/19/2018. (KTT)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/2/2018. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/19/2018. (KTT)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Dodge Chrysler Group, Sergio Marchionne. (LD)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Department of Transportation, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LD)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dodge Chrysler Group, Sergio Marchionne, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Department of Transportation with Jury Demand Filing fee $400.00, receipt number TPA53615 filed by Keith R. Caldwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Dodge Chrysler Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Marchionne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodge Chrysler Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith R. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?