Peron v. JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Plaintiff: Frank Peron
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co - Parent of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02618
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #13 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Frank Peron. Related case(s): no (Cornett, Sherry)
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested persons order by Frank Peron. (Cornett, Sherry)
December 18, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Interested persons order by JPMorgan Chase & Co. identifying Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate J.P. Morgan Treasury Technologies Corporation for JPMorgan Chase & Co... (Bremmer, Cathleen)
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. Related case(s): No (Bremmer, Cathleen)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/7/2018. (KTT)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/7/2018. (KTT)
November 29, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release Agreement)(Bremmer, Cathleen)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Y. Baggett on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Baggett, Lori)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathleen Bell Bremmer on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Bremmer, Cathleen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 TERMINATED. NOTICE of Appearance by Cathleen Bell Bremmer and Lori Y. Baggett Appearance by Robert Quincy Bird on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Bird, Robert) ***TERMINATED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1.05-COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO USE SAME ECF LOGIN AS SIGNATURE BLOCK*** Modified on 11/27/2018 (LD).
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #7 Defendant's Consented Motion for Enlargement of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including November 29, 2018 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/16/2018. (GMD)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Bird, Robert)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 10/26/2018 by Frank Peron as to JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Cornett, Sherry)
October 28, 2018 Filing 5 TERMINATED. PROOF of service by Frank Peron (Cornett, Sherry). NOTE: Incorrect event code; counsel notified to re-file selecting: Civil Events - Initial Pleadings and Service - Service of Process - Summons returned executed/un-executed. Modified on 10/29/2018 (LD).
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to JPMorgan Chase & Co.(LD)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Frank Peron. (Cornett, Sherry)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:18-cv-2618-T-35CPT. (NAS)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase & Co. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113A-14751094) filed by Frank Peron. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornett, Sherry) Modified on 10/25/2018 (LD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (LD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peron v. JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Peron
Represented By: Sherry Georgene Cornett
Represented By: Ruthamar Hyppolite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co - Parent of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Cathleen Bell Bremmer
Represented By: Lori Y. Baggett
Represented By: Robert Quincy Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?