Nautilus Insurance Company v. A.J. Cardinal Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ANDRE JENNINGS, SR., ALEJANDRO URIBE, A.J. CARDINAL GROUP, LLC d/b/a EAGLE ONE SECURITY FORCE and A.J. Cardinal Group, LLC
Case Number: 8:2018cv02778
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Alejandro Uribe answer or response due 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 12/26/2018. (RLH)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 11-21-2018 by Nautilus Insurance Company as to Alejandro Uribe. (Lane, Stella)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Complaint by Alejandro Uribe. (Theophilopoulos, Gerasimos)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Lane, Stella)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to A.J. Cardinal Group, LLC, Andre Jennings, Sr., Alejandro Uribe. (LNR)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/15/2008. (LNR)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:18-cv-2778-T-17CPT. (SMS)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14810585) filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Lane, Stella) Modified text on 11/13/2018 (LNR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautilus Insurance Company v. A.J. Cardinal Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRE JENNINGS, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO URIBE
Represented By: Gerasimos (Jerry) Theophilopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.J. CARDINAL GROUP, LLC d/b/a EAGLE ONE SECURITY FORCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.J. Cardinal Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Stella J. Lane
Represented By: Christina Lee Flatau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?