FCPR Acquisition, LLC v. PCC Processing Technologies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: FCPR Acquisition, LLC
Defendant: Dell'Orco & Villani, SRL, Sergio Dell'Orco, Frank J. Levy, PCC Processing Technologies, LLC and Stellamcor, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2018cv02895
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Consent Order) (BES)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT ORDER Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/25/2019. (CCB)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 60-DAY ORDER dismissing case in accord with the attached order. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions/deadlines and to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/22/2019. (CCB)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT DECREE by FCPR Acquisition, LLC. (Fernandez, Alejandro)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of settlement by FCPR Acquisition, LLC (Fernandez, Alejandro)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BES)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Sergio Dell'Orco, Dell'Orco & Villani, SRL, Frank J. Levy, PCC Processing Technologies, LLC, Stellamcor, Inc. (BES)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/29/2018. (SAO)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:18-cv-2895-T-02JSS. (SJB)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by FCPR Acquisition, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Fernandez, Alejandro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FCPR Acquisition, LLC v. PCC Processing Technologies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell'Orco & Villani, SRL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Dell'Orco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCC Processing Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stellamcor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FCPR Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Alejandro J. Fernandez
Represented By: Stephen J. Leahu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?