Gray v. Ace American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Marshall Scott Gray and Marshall Scott Gray
Defendant: The Chubb Group, Ace American Insurance Company and Chubb North American Claims
Case Number: 8:2018cv02912
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Marshall Scott Gray. Related case(s): No (McLeod, Michael)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Marshall Scott Gray. (McLeod, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/30/2018. (SAO)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:18-cv-2912-T-02JSS. (SJB)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Relief And Breach of Contract against Ace American Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14872718 filed by Marshall Scott Gray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subject Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(McLeod, Michael) Modified on 11/29/2018 to show filing fee (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Ace American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chubb Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb North American Claims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Marshall Scott Gray
Represented By: Michael W. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Scott Gray
Represented By: Michael W. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?