Brand X High Performance Marine Inc. v. Azmann
Plaintiff: Brand X High Performance Marine Inc.
Defendant: Bill Azmann and The unnamed 2000 Hustler model 388 Slingshot built vessel bearing Hull Identification Number GLE385331900, her engines, tackle, apparel, furnishing and appurtenances in rem
Case Number: 8:2018cv02937
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 26 Defendant Vessel's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint in rem claim only by The unnamed 2000 Hustler model 388 Slingshot built vessel bearing Hull Identification Number GLE385331900, her engines, tackle, apparel, furnishing and appurtenances in rem.(Valcourt, Matthew)
January 14, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER of service returned executed by Brand X High Performance Marine Inc. as to Brand X High Performance Marine Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons (which service of was waived))(O'Brien, Russell) Modified text on 1/15/2019 (AG).
January 9, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 Verified MOTION for order to show cause why arrest should not be vacated MOTION to Vacate #1 Complaint in rem action or set bond filed by Brand X High Performance Marine Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Notice of Claim of Lien, #2 Exhibit 2 -Certificate of Release of Lien, #3 Exhibit 3 -Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 -Def's Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit 5 -Def's Draft Motion for Sanctions, #6 Exhibit 6 -Amended Not-Voluntary Dismissal, #7 Exhibit 7 -Email Correspondence, #8 Exhibit 8 -Activity in case re: DE20)(O'Brien, Russell)
January 4, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Bill Azmann from 01/03/2019 to 01/06/2019. (Gesten, Ryan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF of publication filed by Brand X High Performance Marine Inc.. Newspaper: Business Observer Date(s) of publication 12/28/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Publication in the Business Observer (Sarasota and Hillsborough))(O'Brien, Russell)
December 27, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The unnamed 2000 Hustler model 388 Slingshot built vessel bearing Hull Identification Number GLE385331900, her engines, tackle, apparel, furnishing and appurtenances in rem. Related case(s): Yes (Valcourt, Matthew)
December 26, 2018 Filing 20 Verified MOTION for order to show cause why arrest should not be vacated, MOTION to Vacate #1 Complaint in rem action or set bond by The unnamed 2000 Hustler model 388 Slingshot built vessel bearing Hull Identification Number GLE385331900, her engines, tackle, apparel, furnishing and appurtenances in rem. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Bond, #2 Exhibit B-Order to Meet and Confer, #3 Exhibit C-St Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit D-Notice Voluntary dismissal St Ct, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause/vacate)(Valcourt, Matthew)
December 26, 2018 Filing 19 CLAIM Verified Statement of Interest and Claim Pursuant to Rule C by The unnamed 2000 Hustler model 388 Slingshot built vessel bearing Hull Identification Number GLE385331900, her engines, tackle, apparel, furnishing and appurtenances in rem. (Valcourt, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brand X High Performance Marine Inc.. Related case(s): yes (O'Brien, Russell)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Brand X High Performance Marine Inc.. (O'Brien, Russell)
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Brand X High Performance Marine Inc. from 12/24/2018 to 12/28/2018. (O'Brien, Russell)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 US Marshal 285 form for arrest in rem. (LD)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Warrant for Arrest In Rem) (BEE)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appoint Substitute Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/10/2018. (BEE)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/7/2018. (KTT)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/7/2018. (KTT)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Brand X High Performance Marine Inc. re #1 Complaint CIVIL COVER SHEET (O'Brien, Russell)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Bill Azmann. (LD)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:18-cv-2937-T-35AAS. (SJB)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Substitute Custodian re #4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Brand X High Performance Marine Inc.. (O'Brien, Russell)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT and indemnification agreement for appointment of substitute custodian. (O'Brien, Russell)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Brand X High Performance Marine Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Russell)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem (Warrant of Arrest of Defendant) by Brand X High Performance Marine Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exh A - Proposed order Directing Issuance of Warrant of Arrest, #2 Exhibit B - Warrant for Arrest in Rem)(O'Brien, Russell)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Brand X High Performance Marine Inc.. (O'Brien, Russell)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bill Azmann; The unnamed 2000 Hustler model 388 Slingshot built vessel bearing Hull Identification Number GLE385331900, her engines, tackle, apparel, furnishing and appurtenances in rem, with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14884215) filed by Brand X High Performance Marine Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices)(O'Brien, Russell) Modified on 12/4/2018 (LD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brand X High Performance Marine Inc. v. Azmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Azmann
Represented By: Ryan D. Gesten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The unnamed 2000 Hustler model 388 Slingshot built vessel bearing Hull Identification Number GLE385331900, her engines, tackle, apparel, furnishing and appurtenances in rem
Represented By: Matthew John Valcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brand X High Performance Marine Inc.
Represented By: Russell O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?