Tavakoli v. Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA)

Plaintiff: Farah Tavakoli
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA)
Case Number: 8:2018cv02974
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Florida Middle District Court
0 Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
1 Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/8/2019, Dispositive motions due by 12/6/2019, Pretrial statement due by 3/24/2020, All other motions due by 3/31/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2020 at 2:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Bench Trial set for term commencing 5/4/2020 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/31/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/29/2019. (BGS)
January 16, 2019 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Tucker, John)
January 16, 2019 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA).(Lehner, Steven)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The Parties may attend the Case Management Conference telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 1/14/2019. (VIV)
January 11, 2019 13 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically for Case Management Conference by Farah Tavakoli. (Tucker, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
January 9, 2019 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA). Related case(s): no (Lehner, Steven)
January 9, 2019 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA) identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation, Corporate Parent Cigna Holdings, Inc. for Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA).. (Lehner, Steven)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Defendant has up to and including January 24, 2019, within which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 1/3/2019. (VIV)
January 3, 2019 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA). (Lehner, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 21, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Farah Tavakoli. (Tucker, John)
December 21, 2018 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Interested persons order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Farah Tavakoli. Related case(s): no (Tucker, John)
December 20, 2018 6 RETURN of service executed on December 14, 2018 by Farah Tavakoli as to Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA). (Tucker, John)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/24/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/10/2018. (BGS)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/24/2018. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/10/2018. (BGS)
December 10, 2018 3 SUMMONS issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA). (BES)
December 10, 2018 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:18-cv-2974-T-36AEP. (SJB)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA) (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14904760) filed by Farah Tavakoli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A)(Tucker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tavakoli v. Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farah Tavakoli
Represented By: John V. Tucker
Represented By: William Chris Demas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America (LINA)
Represented By: Steven D. Lehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?