Stopler v. Nissan North America Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda Stopler
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc. and Geico Indemnity Company
Undetermined: Peter Grilli
Case Number: 8:2018cv03028
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Default by Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit GEICO Declaration)(Amos, Kenneth)
February 13, 2019 Filing 32 AMENDED NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on Thursday, August 8, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (Half Day) before Peter J. Grilli, Esq..(Grilli, Peter) Modified text on 2/14/2019 (KMM).
February 11, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Eugene Amos, Jr on behalf of Geico Indemnity Company (Amos, Kenneth)
February 8, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Davis Ronald Watson, III on behalf of Geico Indemnity Company (Watson, Davis)
February 8, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Davis Ronald Watson, III on behalf of Geico Indemnity Company (Watson, Davis)
February 8, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Davis Ronald Watson, III on behalf of Geico Indemnity Company (Watson, Davis)
February 7, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Davis Ronald Watson, III on behalf of Geico Indemnity Company (Watson, Davis) Modified text on 2/8/2019 (KMM). *** Each attorney making an appearance in the case should be the signer of the document and enter a notice of attorney appearance in CM/ECF ***
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER appointing Peter Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for August 8, 2019. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/4/2019. (KAK)
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on August 8, 2019 at 1:00 pm before Peter Grilli. (Moore, Joshua)
January 31, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Related case order and track 2 notice by Rhonda Stopler. (Moore, Joshua)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #22 ), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/22/2019. (TWL)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the February 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Conduct mediation hearing by 8/16/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/22/2019. (TWL)
January 17, 2019 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hosley, Frank)
January 16, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of service of documents by Rhonda Stopler (Moore, Joshua) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (KMM).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant GEICO Indemnity Company (Doc. #18 ) is hereby referred to the Honorable Thomas G. Wilson, United States Magistrate Judge, for the issuance of a report and recommendation, including any hearings, motions, and deadlines related thereto. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/16/2019. (KAK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
January 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for default judgment against Geico Indemnity Company by Rhonda Stopler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Moore, Joshua)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Geico Indemnity Company (KMM)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for default by Clerk against Geico Indemnity Company by Rhonda Stopler. (Moore, Joshua) Modified relief and text on 1/4/2019 (KMM).
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Rhonda Stopler. Related case(s): No (Moore, Joshua)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by January 17, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/3/2019. (KAK)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #12 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nissan North America, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Hosley, Frank)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/20/2018. (TWL)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE to counsel of new case number and judge assignment. 8:18-cv-3028-T-33TGW. (AG)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Northern District of Florida (Tallahassee Division); Case Number 4:18-cv-558-MW/CAS. File with documents numbered 1-8, received electronically filed by Nissan North America, Inc.(AG)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00558. File received electronically
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The motion to transfer, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to take all necessary steps to effectuate the transfer of this case to the Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division. Upon transfer, the Clerk is directed to close this case in the Northern District of Florida, Tallahassee Division. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/17/2018. (kjw) [Transferred from flnd on 12/17/2018.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Change Venue Unopposed and Memorandum in Support by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (HOSLEY, FRANK) [Transferred from flnd on 12/17/2018.]
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/20/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/22/2019. Discovery due by 4/5/2019. Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/6/2018. (kjw) [Transferred from flnd on 12/17/2018.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Regarding Electronic Filing and Attorney Admissions Requirement - ATTORNEY JOSHUA D MOORE. (kjw) [Transferred from flnd on 12/17/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC. (HOSLEY, FRANK) [Transferred from flnd on 12/17/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC identifying Corporate Parent NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD for NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC.. (HOSLEY, FRANK) [Transferred from flnd on 12/17/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HOSLEY, FRANK) [Transferred from flnd on 12/17/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC from Circuit Court of the Second Judicial Circuit in and for Leon County, Florida, case number 2018-CA-002370. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4350079.), filed by NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (HOSLEY, FRANK) [Transferred from flnd on 12/17/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stopler v. Nissan North America Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Stopler
Represented By: Branden Weber
Represented By: Joshua Dustin Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Frank D. Hosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kenneth Eugene Amos, Jr.
Represented By: Davis Ronald Watson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Peter Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?