Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC v. 9.65 Acres of Land in Hillsborough County, Florida more or less et al
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC
Defendant: Brenda Moss, Unknown Owners, If Any, Tampa Electric Company, Farm Credit of Central Florida, ACA, Wayne G Moss, Patricia A Conrad, 9.65 Acres of Land in Hillsborough County, Florida more or less, IMC Development Corp., as successor to Alafia-Keysville Land Co, Raymond E Conrad, Raymond E. Conrad, Unknown Owners, Brenda K. Moss, IMC Development Corp., Wayne G. Moss, Patricia A. Conrad and 9.65 Acres of Land in Hillsborough County, Florida
Case Number: 8:2018cv03059
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Sealed Document: S-45.(LNR)
February 12, 2019 Filing 44 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Farm Credit of Central Florida, ACA. (LNR)
February 12, 2019 Filing 43 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to IMC Development Corp. (LNR)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ENDORSED ORDER granting #38 Florida Gas Transmission Company, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 2/12/2019. (AMM)
February 11, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Farm Credit of Central Florida, ACA by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
February 11, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against IMC Development Corp. by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #38 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Documents Under Seal filed by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 2/5/2019. (RLH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
February 5, 2019 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Documents Under Seal by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 37 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite: MOTION HEARING held on 2/4/2019 re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC, #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. Court Reporter: Sharon A. Miller (LYB)
February 3, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC of Filing Disclaimer of Interest of Tampa Electric Company. (Loeb, Ethan)
February 3, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC of Filing Disclaimer of Interest of Raymond E. and Patricia A. Conrad. (Loeb, Ethan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment of Filing Declaration of Blair Lichtenwalter. (Loeb, Ethan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Loeb, Ethan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding FERC Documentation by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (part 1), #4 Exhibit C (part 2), #5 Exhibit C (part 3), #6 Exhibit C (part 4), #7 Exhibit C (part 5), #8 Exhibit C (part 6), #9 Exhibit C (part 7), #10 Exhibit C (part 8), #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E)(Loeb, Ethan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment and incorporated memorandum of law filed by Brenda K. Moss, Wayne G. Moss. (Gaylord, S.)
January 30, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction for immediate possession filed by Brenda K. Moss, Wayne G. Moss. (Gaylord, S.)
January 30, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Brenda K. Moss, Wayne G. Moss.(Gaylord, S.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of service by publication by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Loeb, Ethan)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Service on IMC Development Corp. by Publication Prior to Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 1/17/2019. (AMM)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #25 MOTION to extend time to Complete Service on IMC Development Corp. by Publication Prior to Hearing and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 1/10/2019. (RLH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
January 10, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to extend time to Complete Service on IMC Development Corp. by Publication Prior to Hearing and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Loeb, Ethan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of counsel of Diligent Search and the Need to Serve by Publication by Ethan Jerome Loeb on behalf of Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 23 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
January 9, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
January 9, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF of service by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING HEARING on #3 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Determining the Right to Condemn Easements and #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12B before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. The Plaintiff shall serve each Defendant no later than 1/10/2019. The Defendants shall respond to the Complaint, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Motion for Preliminary Injunction no later than 1/30/2019. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 1/3/2019. (AMM)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER referring motion for report and recommendation: #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC, #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 12/28/2018. (RLH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
December 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 12/26/2018. (SRC)
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment (of Filing Proposed Order) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loeb, Ethan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Loeb, Ethan)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich. (JNB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 1.05 (e): The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. (signed by deputy clerk). (JNB)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:18-cv-3059-T-17CPT. (SJB)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citrus LLC, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan, Inc., Other Affiliate Energy Transfer Partners L.P for Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC.. (Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST for oral argument re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Main Document, #2 Exhibit A Part 1, #3 Exhibit A Part 2, #4 Exhibit A Part 3, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Main Document, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC re #4 MOTION for preliminary injunction , #3 MOTION for partial summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Main Document)(Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for partial summary judgment by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION filed by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Loeb, Ethan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14948799) filed by Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Loeb, Ethan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC v. 9.65 Acres of Land in Hillsborough County, Florida more or less et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners, If Any
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tampa Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Credit of Central Florida, ACA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne G Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9.65 Acres of Land in Hillsborough County, Florida more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMC Development Corp., as successor to Alafia-Keysville Land Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond E Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond E. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda K. Moss
Represented By: S. Cary Gaylord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMC Development Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne G. Moss
Represented By: S. Cary Gaylord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9.65 Acres of Land in Hillsborough County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Gas Tranmission Company, LLC
Represented By: Ethan Jerome Loeb
Represented By: Jon P. Tasso
Represented By: Allison Doucette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?