The City of Clearwater in the County of Pinellas v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: The City of Clearwater in the County of Pinellas
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Frederick Company, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Mallinckrodt PLC, SPECGX, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Insys Therapeutics, Cephalon, Inc. and The Purdue Frederick Company
Case Number: 8:2018cv03084
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 21:801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Case transferred from Florida Middle has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45009, filed 01/17/2019. (JNB)
January 16, 2019 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio pursuant to #25 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order(CTO-74) transferring case re: MDL number: 2804. (AG)
January 16, 2019 Filing 25 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of Ohio MDL case number: 2804. (AG)
January 14, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Purdue Pharma L.P. (Kissane, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Purdue Pharma L.P. Related case(s): yes. (Kissane, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by The City of Clearwater in the County of Pinellas identifying Corporate Parent City of Clearwater for The City of Clearwater in the County of Pinellas. (Kwall, Louis)
January 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The City of Clearwater in the County of Pinellas. Related case(s): Yes. (Kwall, Louis)
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Related case(s): yes. (Ercole, Brian)
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Ercole, Brian)
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Mallinckrodt, LLC, SPECGX, LLC. Related case(s): yes. (Hearn, Robert)
January 11, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Mallinckrodt, LLC, SPECGX, LLC. (Hearn, Robert)
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Furness, Amy)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Related case(s): yes. (Furness, Amy)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by McKesson Corporation. Related case(s): yes. (Silverglate, Spencer)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by McKesson Corporation. (Silverglate, Spencer)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gulde, Virginia)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Related case(s): yes. (Gulde, Virginia)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. Related case(s): yes. (Pratico, Steven)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Other Affiliate AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Other Affiliate AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.(Pratico, Steven)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Vitale, Michael)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cardinal Health, Inc. Related case(s): Yes. (Vitale, Michael)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 11-26-18 by The City of Clearwater in the County of Pinellas as to Cephalon, Inc. (Kwall, Louis)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 11-27-18 by The City of Clearwater in the County of Pinellas as to Insys Therapeutics. (Kwall, Louis)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/28/2018. (KTT)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/28/2018. (KTT)
December 24, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:18-cv-3084-Tpa-35JSS. (NAS)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 6th Judicial Circuit, Pinellas County, Florida, case number 18-007492-CI filed in State Court on 11/15/18. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14956428 filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents Part 1 of 3, #4 State Court Other Documents Part 2 of 3, #5 State Court Other Documents Part 3 of 3, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Silverglate, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The City of Clearwater in the County of Pinellas v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Virginia Gulde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Spencer H. Silverglate
Represented By: Francisco Ramos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: A. Brian Albritton
Represented By: Robert R. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Furness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Furness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Virginia Gulde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Daniel J. Kissane
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Christopher John Donegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Virginia Gulde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Kissane
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Christopher John Donegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Victoria J. Oguntoye
Represented By: Steven Charles Pratico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics
Represented By: William Newton Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Clearwater in the County of Pinellas
Represented By: Louis Kwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?