United States of America v. Castanheiro
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Nigel Castanheiro
Case Number: 8:2018mc00090
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Dkt. #6 ) of the Magistrate Judge is adopted, confirmed, and approved in all respects and is made a part of this order for all purposes, including appellate review. The United States of America's Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons (Dkt. #1 ) is granted. The Respondent shall comply with the IRS summons served upon him. Respondent shall appear before Revenue Officer Marcie Kay, or any other designated office of the Internal Revenue Service, at such time and place as may hereafter be fixed by Revenue Officer Kay or her designee, to give testimony and produce for examination and copying the books, records, papers, and other data as demanded by the summons. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/14/2018. (SMB)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America; recommending that the respondent be ordered to comply with the IRS summons served upon him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/29/2018. (DMS)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson: SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 11/29/2018. (DIGITAL) (DMS)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 US Marshal 285 form for service. (LSS)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 PROOF of service by United States of America (Rudy, John)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to show cause why IRS summons should not be enforced as to Nigel Castanheiro. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/29/2018 at 11:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12A before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Directing the Internal Revenue Service or the U.S. Marshal Service to serve respondent, on or before October 31, 2018, with a copy of this Order and the petition, including any attachments. The respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this Order to respond to the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/22/2018. (DMS)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Castanheiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nigel Castanheiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?