Stambaugh et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: John Stambaugh, J Philip Stambaugh and J. Philip Stambaugh, Jr.
Defendant: Techtronic Industries Power Equipment and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00027
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Sean P Flynn
1 Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/30/2020, Dispositive motions due by 6/29/2020, Pretrial Conference set for TUESDAY, NOVEMBER 3, 2020 at 9:45 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr., Jury Trial set for DECEMBER 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/15/2019. (AC)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Branton, Christopher)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Techtronic Industries Power Equipment. Related case(s): yes (Branton, Christopher)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Techtronic Industries Power Equipment identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.; Corporate Parent Techtronic Industries Co., Ltd. for Techtronic Industries Power Equipment. (Branton, Christopher) Modified text on 1/18/2019 (BSN).
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Fulton on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Techtronic Industries Power Equipment (Fulton, Robert)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Danielle Duga on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Techtronic Industries Power Equipment (Duga, Nicole)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 1/7/2019. (SMB)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-27-T-30SPF. (SJB)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pinellas County Circuit Court, case number 2018-CA-7740 filed in State Court on 11/29/18. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14983195 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet 5, #6 State Court Other Documents 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 State Court COMPLAINT, #9 State Court ANSWER, #10 State Court ANSWER, #11 State Court Docket Sheet)(Branton, Christopher) Modified text on 1/7/2019 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stambaugh et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stambaugh
Represented By: Benjamin L. Crawford
Represented By: Stephen A. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Philip Stambaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Philip Stambaugh, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin L. Crawford
Represented By: Stephen A. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries Power Equipment
Represented By: Christopher Shawn Branton
Represented By: Nicole D. Walsh
Represented By: Robert M. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Shawn Branton
Represented By: Nicole D. Walsh
Represented By: Robert M. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?