Miller v. United Van Lines, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Suzi Miller and Suzana Miller
Defendant: United Van Lines, LLC and UniGroup, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00036
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 14706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This cause is dismissed without prejudice. All pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/30/2019. (SMB)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to file a Case Management Report pursuant to Local Rule 3.05. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/10/2019. (SMB)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Charles D. Radeline, Esq., as Counsel for Plaintiff. The plaintiff has 30 days to find new counsel. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order, and any subsequent filings in the case, to the plaintiff, Suzana Miller, at 13046 Race Track Road #222, Tampa, FL 33626. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/5/2019. (DMS)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as counsel by Charles D. Radeline as to Suzana Miller. (Radeline, Charles) Modified on 3/20/2019 (BSN).
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #11 Amended Complaint by United Van Lines, LLC.(Roberts, Lawrence)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Van Lines, LLC filed by Suzi Miller.(Radeline, Charles)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall separately file her Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/31/2019. (SMB)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint by Suzi Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint).(Radeline, Charles)
January 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Suzi Miller. Related case(s): no (Radeline, Charles)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by UniGroup, Inc. (Roberts, Lawrence) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (BSN).
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United Van Lines, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Unigroup, Inc., Corporate Parent Transportation Services Group, Inc. for United Van Lines, LLC. (Roberts, Lawrence) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (BSN).
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by United Van Lines, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal of Filing State Court File (Roberts, Lawrence)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 1/7/2019. (SMB)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-36-T-30TGW. (SJB)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of consent to join by UniGroup, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal . (Roberts, Lawrence)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, Hillsborough County, case number 18-CA-10728 J filed in State Court on 10/31/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14986631 filed by United Van Lines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, Lawrence) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. United Van Lines, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Van Lines, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence J. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UniGroup, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence J. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzi Miller
Represented By: Charles David Radeline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzana Miller
Represented By: Charles David Radeline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?