Collins v. Zoltan Bereczki, D.O. et al
Plaintiff: Cherish Collins
Defendant: Laser Spine Surgical Center, LLC, Zoltan Bereczki, D.O. and Laser Spine Institute, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00162
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of hearing: Status Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Susan C. Bucklew. (JD)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Notice: This case is STAYED as to Defendants Laser Spine Institute, LLC and Laser Spine Surgical Center, LLC. The case remains active as to Defendant Zoltan Bereckzi, D.O. Plaintiff is directed to file and serve, on or before October 1, 2019, and every three months thereafter, a status report regarding the state court proceedings. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 3/20/2019. (JD)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Laser Spine Institute, LLC, Laser Spine Surgical Center, LLC of Assignment for the Benefit of Creditors Proceedings (Peterson, Edward)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Status Conference and Stay of Proceedings by All Defendants. (Wetzel, James)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/31/2020, Dispositive motions due by 3/2/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2020 at 08:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Susan C. Bucklew, Conduct mediation hearing by 2/14/2020. This case is set for a jury trial on the Court's July 2020 trial calendar. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 3/13/2019. (JD)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Wetzel, James)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Laser Spine Institute, LLC, Laser Spine Surgical Center, LLC, Zoltan Bereczki, D.O..(Wetzel, James)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Cherish Collins re 6 Order no pdf of Citizenship (Barnes, Heather)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Wetzel on behalf of Laser Spine Institute, LLC, Laser Spine Surgical Center, LLC, Zoltan Bereczki, D.O. (Wetzel, James)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a notice by February 1, 2019 that informs the Court of the names and citizenships of all of the members of LSI Holdco, LLC. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 1/25/2019. (JD)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Cherish Collins re #3 Order pdf of Citizenship (Barnes, Heather)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a notice by February 1, 2019 that informs the Court of the names and citizenships of all of the members of each limited liability company. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 1/22/2019. (JD)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Laser Spine Institute, LLC, Laser Spine Surgical Center, LLC, Zoltan Bereczki, D.O. (JCG)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laser Spine Institute, LLC, Laser Spine Surgical Center, LLC, Zoltan Bereczki, D.O. with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA055024 filed by Cherish Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Zoltan Bereczki, D.O. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laser Spine Surgical Center, LLC
Represented By: James D. Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoltan Bereczki, D.O.
Represented By: James D. Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laser Spine Institute, LLC
Represented By: James D. Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherish Collins
Represented By: Heather N. Barnes
Represented By: Charles Steven Yerrid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?