Roor International BV et al v. Camelot Super Smoke Shop, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Camelot Super Smoke Shop, Inc., Charles Knight, Sr and Laurel Knight
Case Number: 8:2019cv00194
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 --motion for an extension of time; extending through 4/1/2019 the time within which the defendants must respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/20/2019. (BK)
March 15, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by All Defendants. (Anderson, Daniel)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time until March 15, 2019, to File Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/8/2019. (Wilson, Thomas)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Anderson, Daniel)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 --defendants' motion for an extension of time; granting an extension through 3/8/2019 of the time within which the defendants must respond to the complaint; denying as moot #13 --motion for an extension of time. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/7/2019. (BK)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Anderson, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Anderson, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Daniel W. Anderson on behalf of Camelot Super Smoke Shop, Inc., Charles Knight, Sr, Laurel Knight (Anderson, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sasson, Jamie)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 1/28/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Charles Knight, Sr. (Sasson, Jamie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 1/28/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Camelot Super Smoke Shop, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 2/13/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Laurel Knight. (Sasson, Jamie)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/25/2019. (GSO)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (CTR)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Camelot Super Smoke Shop, Inc., Charles Knight, Sr, Laurel Knight. (CTR)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-194-T-23TGW. (SJB)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15052618) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Camelot Super Smoke Shop, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camelot Super Smoke Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Knight, Sr
Represented By: Daniel W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel Knight
Represented By: Daniel W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?