Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Y-Cam Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Defendant: Y-Cam Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00275
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Dismissal, #2 Order of Dismissal) (BES)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #9 ), this case is dismissed with each side to pay its own fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/27/2019. (DLB)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC (Watson, Coleman)
February 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER: On February 1, 2019, the Complaint in this matter was filed (Doc. # 1) and the summons was duly issued on February 4, 2019. (Doc. # 5). As described in the Court's order of February 4, 2019, Plaintiff has 90 days from the date of the filing of the Complaint to perfect service. (Doc. # 4). Based on the Court's review of the docket, it appears that service of process has not yet been effected on Defendant. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to provide a status report to the Court by February 28, 2019, as to its efforts to serve Defendant. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/24/2019. (DLB)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Watson, Coleman)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BES)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Y-Cam Solutions, LLC. (BES)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/4/2019. (TWL)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/4/2019. (TWL)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-275-T-33SPF. (SJB)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Y-Cam Solutions, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15083221) filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Watson, Coleman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Y-Cam Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Represented By: Coleman W. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y-Cam Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?