Bohan v. Bartnett
Plaintiff: Gloria Bohan
Defendant: Timothy Bartnett
Case Number: 8:2019cv00290
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Timothy Bartnett. (Cole, Richard)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #14 Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have up to and including April 8, 2019 to file his answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/19/2019. (APF)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Timothy Bartnett. (Cole, Richard)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Timothy Bartnett. (Cole, Richard)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #10 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have up to and including March 19, 2019 to file his answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/21/2019. (APF)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Timothy Bartnett. Related case(s): No (Cole, Richard)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Timothy Bartnett. (Cole, Richard)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Cole, III on behalf of Timothy Bartnett. (Cole, Richard)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order, #7 Certificate of counsel by Gloria Bohan. (Roberts, Barry)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 ***TERMINATED, contacted counsel to refile using proper event.***CERTIFICATE of counsel by Barry Roberts on behalf of Gloria Bohan (Roberts, Barry) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (LNR).
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gloria Bohan. Related case(s): no (Roberts, Barry)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/7/2019. (KTT)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/7/2019. (KTT)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Timothy Bartnett. (LNR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-290-T-35AEP. (NAS)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Bartnett (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15088751) filed by Gloria Bohan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Roberts, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohan v. Bartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Bohan
Represented By: Barry Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Bartnett
Represented By: Richard J. Cole, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?