Schalamar Creek Mobile Homeowner's Association, Inc. v. Adler et al

Plaintiff: SCHALAMAR CREEK MOBILE HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION, INC
Defendant: OSPREY LINKS, LLC, R. SCOTT PROVOST, The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, LORRAINE DEMARCO, David Eastman, RICHARD LEE, CHARLES CROOK, LUTZ, BOBO & TELFAIR, P.A., RANDALL KNAPP, J & J SANITATION SERVICES INC, Steven H. Adler, JULIE JENNINGS, MARTI NEWKIRK, MUREX PROPERTIES, L.L.C, Florida Manufactured Housing Association, Inc., SCHALAMAR GP, INC., Schalamar GP, Inc, J & J Sanitation Services, Inc., Steven Adler and Murex Properties, L.L.C.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00291
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Defendant Florida Manufactured Housing Association, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support) filed by Schalamar Creek Mobile Homeowner's Association, Inc. (Perry, Daniel)
April 2, 2019 Filing 16 ***TERMINATED-FILED USING INCORRECT EVENT-COUNSEL CONTACTED TO REFILE USING CORRENT EVENT*** REPLY re #11 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Defendant Florida Manufactured Housing Association, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support) by Schalamar Creek Mobile Homeowner's Association, Inc. (Perry, Daniel) Modified on 4/3/2019 (LSS).
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Steven Adler, Charles Crook, Lorraine DeMarco, David Eastman, J & J Sanitation Services, Inc., Julie Jennings, Randall Knapp, Richard Lee, Lutz, Bobo & Telfair, P.A., Murex Properties, L.L.C., Marti Newkirk, Osprey Links, LLC, R. Scott Provost, Schalamar GP, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barlow, Mahlon)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of compliance re 12 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice (for Stephen M. Ryan and Sam Crockett Neel) by Florida Manufactured Housing Association, Inc. (Upshaw, Anthony)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Schalamar Creek Mobile Homeowner's Association, Inc. (Perry, Daniel)
March 22, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Stephen M. Ryan, appearing on behalf of Florida Manufactured Housing Association, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055852.) Related document: #9 MOTION for Stephen M. Ryan to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 22, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Sam Crockett Neel, appearing on behalf of Florida Manufactured Housing Association, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055852.) Related document: #10 MOTION for Sam Crockett Neel to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #10 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Stephen M. Ryan and Sam Crockett Neel may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Florida Manufactured Housing Association, Inc., with Attorney Anthony N. Upshaw designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 3/19/2019. (JMF)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Defendant Florida Manufactured Housing Association, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support) by Florida Manufactured Housing Association, Inc.. (Upshaw, Anthony)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Sam Crockett Neel to appear pro hac vice by Florida Manufactured Housing Association, Inc.. (Upshaw, Anthony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Stephen M. Ryan to appear pro hac vice by Florida Manufactured Housing Association, Inc.. (Upshaw, Anthony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Steven Adler, Charles Crook, Lorraine DeMarco, David Eastman, J & J Sanitation Services, Inc., Julie Jennings, Randall Knapp, Richard Lee, Lutz, Bobo & Telfair, P.A., Murex Properties, L.L.C., Marti Newkirk, Osprey Links, LLC, R. Scott Provost, Schalamar GP, Inc, The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Barlow, Mahlon)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT CODE. COUNSEL TO REFILE AS MOTION***Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof ANSWER to Complaint by Steven Adler, Charles Crook, Lorraine DeMarco, David Eastman, J & J Sanitation Services, Inc., Julie Jennings, Randall Knapp, Richard Lee, Lutz, Bobo & Telfair, P.A., Murex Properties, L.L.C., Marti Newkirk, Osprey Links, LLC, R. Scott Provost, Schalamar GP, Inc, The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Barlow, Mahlon) Modified on 3/12/2019 (LSS).
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Schalamar Creek Mobile Homeowner's Association, Inc. Related case(s): No (Perry, Daniel)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 2/6/2019. (AC)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Steven Adler, Charles Crook, Lorraine DeMarco, David Eastman, Florida Manufactured Housing Association, Inc., J & J Sanitation Services, Inc., Julie Jennings, Randall Knapp, Richard Lee, Lutz, Bobo & Telfair, P.A., Murex Properties, L.L.C., Marti Newkirk, Osprey Links, LLC, R. Scott Provost, Schalamar GP, Inc, The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (BSN)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-291-T-30AEP. (SJB)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15092278) filed by SCHALAMAR CREEK MOBILE HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH A - D)(Perry, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (BSN).
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 REFILED CORRECTLY RE #2 COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH A - D, #2 Proposed Summons ADLER, #3 Proposed Summons CROOK, #4 Proposed Summons EASTMAN, #5 Proposed Summons DEMARCO, #6 Proposed Summons FL-MANUFACTURED HOUSING, #7 Proposed Summons JENNINGS, #8 Proposed Summons J&J-SANITATION, #9 Proposed Summons KNAPP, #10 Proposed Summons LUTZ-BOBO-TELFAIR, #11 Proposed Summons MUREX-PROPERTIES, #12 Proposed Summons NEWKIRK, #13 Proposed Summons NORTHWESTERN-MUTUAL, #14 Proposed Summons OSPREY-LINKS, #15 Proposed Summons RSCOTT-PROVOST, #16 Proposed Summons RICHARD-LEE, #17 Proposed Summons SCHALAMAR-GP, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perry, Daniel) Modified on 2/5/2019 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schalamar Creek Mobile Homeowner's Association, Inc. v. Adler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSPREY LINKS, LLC
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. SCOTT PROVOST
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORRAINE DEMARCO
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Eastman
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD LEE
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES CROOK
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUTZ, BOBO & TELFAIR, P.A.
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL KNAPP
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J SANITATION SERVICES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven H. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE JENNINGS
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTI NEWKIRK
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUREX PROPERTIES, L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Manufactured Housing Association, Inc.
Represented By: Sam Crockett Neel
Represented By: Anthony Nolan Upshaw
Represented By: Stephen Michael Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHALAMAR GP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schalamar GP, Inc
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J Sanitation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Adler
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murex Properties, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mahlon Herbert Barlow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCHALAMAR CREEK MOBILE HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION, INC
Represented By: Daniel W. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?