Mendel v. Nestle Waters North America, Inc.

Plaintiff: Louis Duke Mendel
Defendant: Nestle Waters North America, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00489
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Taylor Bartlett to appear pro hac vice by Louis Duke Mendel. (Garcia, Anthony) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 --motion to stay; directing the clerk to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE the case; denying without prejudice #3 --motion to dismiss; permitting the plaintiff to move by 5/6/2019 to remand; response to a motion to remand due 5/20/2019; absent a motion to remand, response to the complaint due 5/20/2019. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/7/2019. (BK)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nestle Waters North America, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Conigliaro, Matthew)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING LIMITED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by Louis Duke Mendel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Garcia, Anthony)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/26/2019. (GSO)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-489-T-23AEP. (SJB)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed in state court on 2/25/19 by Nestle Waters North America, Inc. (DG)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit In And For Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 19-CA-000778 filed in State Court on 01/22/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15168559 filed by Nestle Waters North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Pending Motions, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Affidavit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 State Court Docket Sheet)(Conigliaro, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendel v. Nestle Waters North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Duke Mendel
Represented By: Anthony Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Waters North America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Conigliaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?