Tsakrios v. Monsato Company et al
Plaintiff: ANDREA TSAKRIOS and MANUEL TSAKRIOS
Defendant: Does 1-50 and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00501
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-01617, filed 03/29/2019. (JNB)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 TRANSFER to the District of Northern District of California. (AG)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California re: MDL case number: 2741. (AG)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: On February 27, 2019, Plaintiffs Manuel Tsakrios and Andrea Tsakrios filed this action against Defendant Monsanto Company. (Doc. #1 ). Plaintiffs describe the "Nature of the Case" as follows: "This is an action for damages suffered by Plaintiff as a direct and proximate result of Defendants' negligent and wrongful conduct in connection with the design, development, manufacture, testing, packaging, promoting, marketing, advertising, distribution, labeling, and/or sale of the herbicide Roundup, containing the active ingredient glyphosate. Plaintiff maintains that Roundup and/or glyphosate is defective, dangerous to human health, unfit and unsuitable to be marketed and sold in commerce and lacked proper warnings and directions as to the dangers associated with its use. Plaintiff's injuries, like those striking thousands of similarly situated victims across the country, were avoidable." (Doc. #1 ). Plaintiffs' counsel filed a Notice (Doc. #8 ) representing that this action is related to "In re Roundup Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2741 (N.D. Cal.)." Thereafter, the Court directed Plaintiffs to provide a status report regarding whether this case should be stayed pending transfer to an MDL court. (Doc. # 10 ). Although the deadline for Plaintiffs to provide the status report has not expired, the Court sua sponte directs the Clerk to STAY and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case pending transfer to the MDL proceedings because the Court has been independently notified by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that a Conditional Transfer Order has been issued for this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/14/2019. (KAK)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER: On February 27, 2019, Plaintiffs Manuel Tsakrios and Andrea Tsakrios filed this action against Defendant Monsanto Company. (Doc. #1 ). Plaintiffs describe the "Nature of the Case" as follows: "This is an action for damages suffered by Plaintiff as a direct and proximate result of Defendants' negligent and wrongful conduct in connection with the design, development, manufacture, testing, packaging, promoting, marketing, advertising, distribution, labeling, and/or sale of the herbicide Roundup, containing the active ingredient glyphosate. Plaintiff maintains that Roundup and/or glyphosate is defective, dangerous to human health, unfit and unsuitable to be marketed and sold in commerce and lacked proper warnings and directions as to the dangers associated with its use. Plaintiff's injuries, like those striking thousands of similarly situated victims across the country, were avoidable." Plaintiffs' counsel filed a Notice (Doc. #8 ) representing that this action is related to "In re Roundup Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2741 (N.D. Cal.)." The Court accordingly directs Plaintiffs to provide a status report by March 15, 2019, discussing whether this case should be stayed pending transfer to an MDL court, such as MDL 2741. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/8/2019. (KAK)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 Document Deleted not to be filed on CM/ECF (Susen, Marcus) Modified image and text on 3/7/2019 (KMM).
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Andrea Tsakrios, Manuel Tsakrios. Related case(s): yes (Susen, Marcus)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/6/2019. (TWL)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/6/2019. (TWL)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 (TERMINATED: Incorrect filing event; counsel notified) PROOF of service by Andrea Tsakrios, Manuel Tsakrios (Susen, Marcus) Modified on 3/5/2019 (AG).
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus John Susen on behalf of Andrea Tsakrios, Manuel Tsakrios (Susen, Marcus)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Does 1-50, Monsanto Company. (KMM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-501-T-33JSS. (SJB)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MANUEL TSAKRIOS with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15178333) filed by MANUEL TSAKRIOS. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Parafinczuk, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsakrios v. Monsato Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA TSAKRIOS
Represented By: Justin R. Parafinczuk
Represented By: C. Moze Cowper
Represented By: Marcus John Susen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL TSAKRIOS
Represented By: Justin R. Parafinczuk
Represented By: C. Moze Cowper
Represented By: Marcus John Susen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?