ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC v. Safeco Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00528
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 motion for briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/15/2019. (DMP)
April 12, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Antonio Morin on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company (Morin, Antonio)
April 11, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Set Schedule for Responses to Amended Complaint and Preliminary Injunction, and Joint Stipulation Regarding Prior Service by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company. (Guzzi, Gary)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER directing Liberty Mutual and Safeco to respond to #19 ACG South's motion for preliminary injunction. By April 26, 2019, Liberty Mutual and Safeco must submit their responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/27/2019. (DMP)
March 25, 2019 Filing 22 RETURN of service executed on March 20, 2019 by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC as to Safeco Insurance Company. (Rollins, Traci)
March 25, 2019 Filing 21 RETURN of service executed on March 22, 2019 by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Rollins, Traci)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Referring Motion for Report and Recommendation: #19 Amended MOTION for preliminary injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/13/2019. (BGS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 12, 2019 Filing 19 Amended MOTION for preliminary injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jennifer Pintacuda, #2 Exhibit B - Agency Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - ACG's Termination Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Sample of Agency 100-Day Letter)(Rollins, Traci)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Plaintiff filed an amended complaint on March 6, 2019, which supersedes the original complaint. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/12/2019. (BGS)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Referring Motion for Report and Recommendation: #2 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/11/2019. (BGS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court will take no further action on the Orders to Show Cause (Docs. 9, 14) and they are discharged. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/11/2019. (BGS)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 Order to show cause filed by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC. (Rollins, Traci)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Plaintiff shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Failure to respond to this Order within the time provided will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/8/2019. (BGS)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Auto Club Group dba AAA Auto Club Group, Other Affiliate Auto Club South Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Auto Club International, Inc., Other Affiliate Automobile et Touring Club du Quebec, Other Affiliate Automobile Club of Michigan, Other Affiliate Traverse Insurance Ltd., Other Affiliate ACG Driver Education, LLC, Other Affiliate ACG Car Care, LLC, Other Affiliate AAA of the Caribbean, Inc., Other Affiliate ACG Financial Services, I, LLC for ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC.. (Rollins, Traci)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC. Related case(s): No (Rollins, Traci)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company filed by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agency Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - ACG's Termination Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Agent Termination Notice, #4 Exhibit D-1 - Examples of Safeco transmittals and ID Cards before March 31, 2019, #5 Exhibit D-2 - Examples of Safeco transmittals and ID Cards after March 31, 2019)(Rollins, Traci)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #9 Order to show cause filed by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC. (Rollins, Traci)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Plaintiff shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Additionally, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS which cures the deficiencies noted herein. Failure to respond to this Order within the time provided will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/5/2019. (BGS)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company. (CTR)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/15/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/1/2019. (BGS)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/15/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/1/2019. (BGS)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-528-T-36AAS. (SJB)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC. (Rollins, Traci)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC. (Rollins, Traci)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jennifer Pintacuda, #2 Exhibit B - Agency Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - ACG's Termination Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Sample of Agency 100-Day Letter)(Rollins, Traci)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15189998) filed by ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agency Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - ACG's Termination Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Agent Termination Notice, #4 Exhibit D-1 - Examples of Safeco Transmittals and ID Cards before 3/31/2019, #5 Exhibit D-2 - Examples of Safeco Transmittals and ID Cards after 3/31/2019)(Rollins, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC v. Safeco Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACG South Insurance Agency, LLC
Represented By: Traci H. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary J. Guzzi
Represented By: Antonio Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary J. Guzzi
Represented By: Antonio Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?