Tran et al v. City of Holmes Beach et al
Plaintiff: Huong L. Tran, Lynn Tran and Richard W. Hazen
Defendant: Thomas O'Brien, Pat Morton, Code Enforcement Board of the city of Holmes Beach, City of Holmes Beach, James McGuinness, Carmel Monti, Jean Peelen, Marvin Grossman, Carol Soustek, The Florida Department of Environmental Protection, Judy Titsworth, Bob Johnson, Environmental Manager, Bureau of Beaches and Coastal Systems, City Commissioners, Code Enforcement Officers and Code Enforcement Board, Florida Department of Environmental Protection, City Building Officials, Mayors of City of Holmes Beach and Chairs and Vice Chairs of the City Commission
Case Number: 8:2019cv00534
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Certificate of Service by Huong L. Tran re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice (Tran, Huong) Modified text on 4/30/2019 (BSN).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #30 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/24/2019. (SMB)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Motion for More Definite Statement (Dkt. #25 ) filed by Defendant City of Holmes Beach is GRANTED. The Amended Verified Complaint (Dkt. #6 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs may file a second amended complaint within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to file a second amended complaint will result in this case being closed without further notice. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/24/2019. (SMB)
April 23, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Florida Department of Environmental Protection. (Mandelbaum, Samuel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 22, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel R. Mandelbaum on behalf of Florida Department of Environmental Protection (Mandelbaum, Samuel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Huong L. Tran re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice (Tran, Huong)
April 17, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Randol D. Mora on behalf of City of Holmes Beach (Mora, Randol)
April 17, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Daigneault on behalf of City of Holmes Beach (Daigneault, Jay)
April 17, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for More Definite Statement by City of Holmes Beach. (Daigneault, Jay)
April 17, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Daigneault on behalf of City of Holmes Beach (Daigneault, Jay)
April 15, 2019 Filing 23 RETURN of service executed on 04/01/2019 by Huong L. Tran as to Environmental Manager, Bureau of Beaches and Coastal Systems. (Tran, Huong)
April 15, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF of service by Huong L. Tran (Tran, Huong)
April 15, 2019 Filing 21 RETURN of service executed on 03/27/2019 by Huong L. Tran as to Code Enforcement Board of the City of Holmes Beach. (Tran, Huong)
April 15, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF of service by Huong L. Tran (Tran, Huong)
April 15, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on 03/27/2019 by Huong L. Tran as to City Building Officials. (Tran, Huong)
April 15, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF of service by Huong L. Tran (Tran, Huong)
April 15, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 03/27/2019 by Huong L. Tran as to City Commissioners. (Tran, Huong)
April 15, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF of service by Huong L. Tran (Tran, Huong)
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 03/27/2019 by Huong L. Tran as to Chairs and Vice Chairs of the City Commission. (Tran, Huong)
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF of service by Huong L. Tran (Tran, Huong)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 03/27/2019 by Huong L. Tran as to Mayors of City of Holmes Beach. (Tran, Huong)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Huong L. Tran (Tran, Huong)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 03/27/2019 by Huong L. Tran as to City of Holmes Beach. (Tran, Huong)
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Huong L. Tran (Tran, Huong)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 04/01/2019 by Huong L. Tran as to Florida Department of Environmental Protection. (Tran, Huong)
April 7, 2019 Filing 8 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT. COUNSEL TO REFILE USING "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED" AND FILE INDIVIUALLY AS TO EACH DEFENDANT*** PROOF of service by Huong L. Tran (Tran, Huong) Modified on 4/8/2019 (LSS).
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Chairs and Vice Chairs of the City Commission, City Building Officials, City Commissioners, City of Holmes Beach, Code Enforcement Board of the City of Holmes Beach, Florida Department of Environmental Protection, Mayors of City of Holmes Beach. (BSN)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Holmes Beach, Code Enforcement Board of the City of Holmes Beach, Florida Department of Environmental Protection, Mayors of City of Holmes Beach, Chairs and Vice Chairs of the City Commission, City Commissioners, City Building Officials. Terminating Carmel Monti (former City Mayor), Pat Morton (current Vice Chair City Commissioner), Thomas O'Brien (former City Building Official), Jean Peelen (former Chair City Commissioner), Carol Soustek (current City Commissioner), Judy Titsworth (City Mayor and former Chair City Commissioner), Marvin Grossman (former City Commissioner) and James McGuinness (current City Building Official) filed by Richard W. Hazen, Huong L. Tran.(BSN)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Richard W. Hazen, Huong L. Tran. Related case(s): yes (JCG)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff Huong L. Tran's Motion for Electronic Filing (Dkt. #2 ) is granted. To register for CM/ECF, Ms. Tran must complete and submit the "ECF Registration Form" found on the Court's website. Plaintiff must comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing, and the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/6/2019. (SMB)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 3/6/2019. (AC)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Electronic filing by Huong L. Tran. (JCG)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Holmes Beach, Code Enforcement Board of the city of Holmes Beach, Marvin Grossman, Bob Johnson, James McGuinness, Carmel Monti, Pat Morton, Thomas O'Brien, Jean Peelen, Carol Soustek, Florida Department of Environmental Protection, Judy Titsworth Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA055517 filed by Richard W. Hazen, Huong L. Tran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran et al v. City of Holmes Beach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huong L. Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W. Hazen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Code Enforcement Board of the city of Holmes Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Holmes Beach
Represented By: Jay Daigneault
Represented By: Randol D. Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McGuinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmel Monti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Peelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Soustek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Florida Department of Environmental Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Titsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Manager, Bureau of Beaches and Coastal Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Code Enforcement Officers and Code Enforcement Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Environmental Protection
Represented By: Samuel R. Mandelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Building Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayors of City of Holmes Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chairs and Vice Chairs of the City Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?