JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Meador et al
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Waterford at Lakeview Village Homeowner's Association, Inc., The Unknown Beneficiaries of the Legacy Trust, Linda Meador, Unknown Parties in Possession #1, Legacy Trust, Unknown Parties in Possession #2, Judge T. Phillips, III and Emerick Holdings
Case Number: 8:2019cv00667
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 20 Transmittal of Record to State Court Received. (LNR)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting #18 Motion to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal. "When a civil action is removed solely under section 1441(a), all defendants who have been properly joined and served must join in or consent to the removal of the action." 28 U.S.C. 1446(b)(2)(A). Defendant Linda Meador does not consent to removal. See (Doc. 16). This cause is remanded to the Circuit Court of the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, Florida. The Clerk is directed to close the case and terminate any pending motions. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/7/2019. (RLH)
May 7, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal by Judge T. Phillips, III. (LNR)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER to strike re: #15 Reply to Response to Motion filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. See L.R. M.D. Fla. 3.01(c). The Clerk is directed to terminate the filing. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/3/2019. (RLH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Of Filing Correspondence From Defendant, Linda Meador, Indicating She Refused To Consent To Removal. (Cantor, Ileen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 15 ***STRICKEN, pursuant to court's endorsed order 17.***REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to remand to State Court, MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cantor, Ileen) Modified text on 5/6/2019 (LNR).
May 1, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTION re #9 MOTION to remand to State Court, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Judge T. Phillips, III by Judge T. Phillips, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LNR)
April 22, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Judge T. Phillips, III. (LNR)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Judge T. Phillips, III. Related case(s): no. (LNR)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co - Parent of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Cantor, Ileen)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT re #9 MOTION to remand to State Court by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Cantor, Ileen)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to remand to State Court by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cantor, Ileen). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 4/18/2019 (LNR).
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 4/5/2019. (SRC)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to extend time; denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Appoint ad Litem. Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. shall refile the motions pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of this District, and, as appropriate, federal substantive law. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/21/2019. (RLH)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/15/2008. (LNR)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of consent to join by Emerick Holdings re #1 Notice of Removal. (LNR)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of consent to join by Judge T. Phillips, III re #1 Notice of Removal. (LNR)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Filed in state court on 2/14/19.) (LNR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to extend time to Effectuate Service on Defendant Emerick Holdings by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Filed in state court on 8/14/18.) (LNR)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 AMENDED COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 2018-CA-004033 filed in State Court on 8/28/18. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA55762 filed by Judge T. Phillips, III. (Attachments: #1 State Court AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 State Court AMENDED ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Meador et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterford at Lakeview Village Homeowner's Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Beneficiaries of the Legacy Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Meador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties in Possession #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties in Possession #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge T. Phillips, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerick Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Amy Concilio
Represented By: Helen Marie Skala
Represented By: Ileen Jill Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?