Connell v. Poynter et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Alan Connell
Defendant: Sergeant Philips, James Robinson, T. Poynter, Officer Godwin, Lieutenant Oster, Captain Thomas, Nurse Victories, Sergeant Johnson, Sergeant Gaskin, Sergeant Dyer, Nurse Sandvig, Howard Tucker and T. Ryans
Case Number: 8:2019cv00668
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to USM on behalf of T. Ryans on 07/02/2019 by Timothy Alan Connell. (BES)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to USM on behalf of T. Poynter on 07/02/2019 by Timothy Alan Connell. (BES)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to USM on behalf of Sergeant Philips on 07/02/2019 by Timothy Alan Connell. (BES)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to USM on behalf of Sergeant Johnson on 07/02/2019 by Timothy Alan Connell. (BES)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to USM on behalf of Sergeant Gaskin on 07/02/2019 by Timothy Alan Connell. (BES)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to USM on behalf of Sergeant Dyer on 07/02/2019 by Timothy Alan Connell. (BES)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to USM on behalf of Nurse Victories on 07/02/2019 by Timothy Alan Connell. (BES)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to USM on behalf of Nurse Sandvig on 07/02/2019 by Timothy Alan Connell. (BES)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to USM on behalf of Lieutenant Oster on 07/02/2019 by Timothy Alan Connell. (BES)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to USM on behalf of James Robinson on 07/02/2019 by Timothy Alan Connell. (BES)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to USM on behalf of Howard Tucker on 07/02/2019 by Timothy Alan Connell. (BES)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to USM on behalf of Officer Godwin on 07/02/2019 by Timothy Alan Connell. (BES)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for waiver of Service sent to USM on behalf of Captain Thomas on 07/02/2019 by Timothy Alan Connell. (BES)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing service by U.S. Marshal and directing Clerk in accord with the attached order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/1/2019. (CCB)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Timothy Alan Connell. Related case(s): yes (BES)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting to an extent #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, directing Petitioner re: compliance with payments, and directing Clerk to mail copy of the attached order. (See order for details) Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/28/2019. (CCB)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/26/2019. (SAO)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Alan Connell. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JCG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Captain Thomas, Lieutenant Oster, Nurse Sandvig, Nurse Victories, Officer Godwin, T. Poynter, James Robinson, Sergeant Dyer, Sergeant Gaskin, Sergeant Johnson, Sergeant Philips, Howard Tucker filed by Timothy Alan Connell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(JCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connell v. Poynter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Philips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Poynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Victories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Gaskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Sandvig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Ryans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Alan Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?