Bacheler v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Francis Peck Bacheler
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00699
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Motion for Craig T. Downs to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 6/18/2019. (BEE)
June 17, 2019 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for leave to file Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Craig T. Downs by Francis Peck Bacheler. (Attachments: #1 Main Document)(Nelson, Nathan)
May 15, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order, #24 Case management and scheduling order by Francis Peck Bacheler. (Nelson, Nathan)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/6/2020, Dispositive motions due by 1/8/2021, Pretrial statement due by 4/20/2021, All other motions due by 4/27/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2021 at 3:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 6/7/2021 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/22/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/1/2019. (BGS)
April 29, 2019 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (McDonald, Francis)
April 16, 2019 Filing 22 BP Exploration & Production Inc. and BP America Production Company's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #21 Amended Complaint by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc..(McDonald, Francis)
April 8, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Francis Peck Bacheler.(Fried, Jana)
April 8, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Francis Peck Bacheler. (Fried, Jana)
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP P.L.C. for BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc... (McDonald, Francis)
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc.. Related case(s): yes (McDonald, Francis)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk is directed to terminate Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, and Don Heller Haycraft as counsel of record for the defendants, and substitute Francis M. McDonald, Jr., Sarah A. Long, and Courtney M. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/28/2019. (BEE) Modified on 3/28/2019 (DG).
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent BP P.L.C. for BP America Production Company.. (McDonald, Francis)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP P.L.C. for BP Exploration & Production Inc... (McDonald, Francis)
March 27, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, and Don Keller Haycraft to withdraw as attorney by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc.. (McDonald, Francis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is directed to SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Order. Additionally, Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS which cures the jurisdictional deficiencies discussed in this Order. Failure to respond within the time provided will result in dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/25/2019. (BGS)
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02. (signed by deputy clerk). (DG)
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02. (signed by deputy clerk). (DG)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02. (signed by deputy clerk). (DG)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/21/2019. (BGS)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/21/2019. (BGS)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel of new case number and judge assignment. Case assigned to District Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New Case Number: 8:19-cv-699-T-36AAS. (AG)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-11101. File received electronically
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/20/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from laed on 3/21/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from laed on 3/21/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from laed on 3/21/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from laed on 3/21/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7239184) filed by Francis Bacheler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party Francis Bacheler(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) [Transferred from laed on 3/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacheler v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc.
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Sarah Anne Long
Represented By: Francis Morton McDonald, Jr.
Represented By: Courtney Michelle King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Sarah Anne Long
Represented By: Francis Morton McDonald, Jr.
Represented By: Courtney Michelle King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Peck Bacheler
Represented By: Craig Downs
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson
Represented By: Jana Marie Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?