Dentistry From The Heart, Inc. v. P. S. Patel Professional Dental Corp., et al.

Plaintiff: Dentistry From The Heart, Inc.
Defendant: P. S. Patel Professional Dental Corp d/b/a California Dental Care & Orthodontics, and Dr. Parag S. Patel, P.S. Patel Professional Dental Corp. and Dr. Parag S. Patel
Case Number: 8:2019cv00749
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to P.S. Patel Professional Dental Corp. (JCG)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Parag S. Patel (JCG)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against P.S. Patel Professional Dental Corp., Parag S. Patel by Dentistry From The Heart, Inc. (Sanks, Terry) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Modified text on 6/26/2019 (JCG).
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 05/20/2019 by Dentistry From The Heart, Inc. as to P.S. Patel Professional Dental Corp., Parag S. Patel. (Sanks, Terry)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Parag S. Patel. (LD)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Dentistry From The Heart, Inc.. (Sanks, Terry)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/15/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/1/2019. (KTT)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/15/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/1/2019. (KTT)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (LD)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-749-T-35AEP. (SJB)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Trademark Infringement and Unfair Competition with Injunctive Relief Sought and Demand for Jury Trial against P. S. Patel Professional Dental Corp d/b/a California Dental Care & Orthodontics, and Dr. Parag S. Patel with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15289842) filed by Dentistry From The Heart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Sanks, Terry) Modified on 3/28/2019 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dentistry From The Heart, Inc. v. P. S. Patel Professional Dental Corp., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dentistry From The Heart, Inc.
Represented By: Terry Marcus Sanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. S. Patel Professional Dental Corp d/b/a California Dental Care & Orthodontics, and Dr. Parag S. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.S. Patel Professional Dental Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Parag S. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?