Hillsborough County Aviation Authority v. Turo Inc.

Plaintiff: Hillsborough County Aviation Authority
Defendant: Turo Inc. and Jane and John Does
Case Number: 8:2019cv00774
Filed: March 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING #6 Plaintiff, the Hillsborough County Aviation Authority's Verified Motion for Temporary Injunction; DENYING #74 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #88 Plaintiff's Opposed Motion to Supplement Preliminary Injunction Exhibits with Documents Created and Published by Turo. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/12/2019. (APF)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING as stated herein #92 Defendant Turo Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Permission to Bring Personal Electronic Devices into Courthouse. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/10/2019. (APF)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING as stated herein #92 Defendant Turo Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Permission to Bring Personal Electronic Devices into Courthouse. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/10/2019. (APF)
July 9, 2019 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #76 Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority(a Florida independent special district), Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Graham, Keith)
July 9, 2019 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #77 Notice to take judicial notice filed by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority(a Florida independent special district), Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Graham, Keith)
July 9, 2019 Filing 92 MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically personal electronic devices and other electronic equipment including laptops, smartphones, presentation remote, 3x2 video switch, LCD Monitor, and necessary cables for video and power for July 11, 2019 evidentiary hearing by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala)
July 6, 2019 Filing 91 DECLARATION of Ashley K. Corkery re #90 Response in Opposition to Motion by Turo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sandridge, Hala)
July 6, 2019 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION to supplement Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction Exhibits with Documents Created and Published by Defendant Turo Inc. filed by Turo Inc.(Sandridge, Hala)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER regarding presentation of evidence at July 11, 2019 hearing. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/3/2019. (APF)
July 2, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION to supplement Preliminary Injunction Exhibits with Documents Created and Published by Defendant Turo Inc. by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Wiggins, Shannon)
July 2, 2019 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Scott Knight by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Wiggins, Shannon)
July 2, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. Plaintiff, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority's Notice of Filing Defendant, Turo Inc.'s Terms of Service, Agreements and Policies Incorporated by Reference Into the Terms of Service and Depictions of Current Tampa International Airport Car Rentals Offered by Defendant Turo Inc. (Wiggins, Shannon)
July 2, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. Notice of Filing Plaintiff, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority's (HCAA) Corrective Exhibit List for July 11, 2019 Hearing on HCAA's Motion for Temporary Injunction. (Wiggins, Shannon)
July 1, 2019 Filing 84 Witness List by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala)
July 1, 2019 Filing 83 Exhibit List For July 11, 2019 Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala)
July 1, 2019 Filing 82 Witness List by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Graham, Keith)
July 1, 2019 Filing 81 Exhibit List. Plaintiff, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority's (HCAA) Exhibit List for July 11, 2019 Hearing on HCAA's Motion for Temporary Injunction by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Graham, Keith)
June 27, 2019 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #75 Motion to dismiss filed by Turo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sandridge, Hala)
June 27, 2019 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #74 Motion to Strike filed by Turo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sandridge, Hala)
June 25, 2019 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Michelle Fang re #77 Notice to take judicial notice, #76 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings by Turo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Solicitation, #2 Exhibit 2 - Turo Terms of Service Revised October 17, 2018, #3 Exhibit 3 - Turo Terms of Service Revised June 20, 2019)(Sandridge, Hala)
June 25, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding #76 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings . Partially Uncontested Motion Requesting Judicial Notice and Consideration of Documents Incorporated by Reference into the Pleadings by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala)
June 25, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings by Turo Inc.(Sandridge, Hala)
June 10, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims with Prejudice of Turo Inc. by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority(a Florida independent special district), Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Graham, Keith)
June 10, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Strike #69 Amended Answer and affirmative defenses to Verified Complaint, Amended Counterclaim of Turo Inc. by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority(a Florida independent special district), Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Graham, Keith)
June 4, 2019 Filing 73 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Graham, Keith)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #6 Plaintiff, The Hillsborough County Aviation Authority's Verified Motion for Temporary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 7 A before Judge Mary S. Scriven. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/30/2019. (APF)
May 24, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE by Turo Inc. re #65 Order on motion to supplement, #70 Affidavit of Supplemental Evidentiary Materials in Response to Plaintiff's Three Rebuttal Exhibits. (Sandridge, Hala)
May 24, 2019 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT of Bethany Lobo re: #65 Order on motion to supplement. Supplemental Affidavit of Bethany Lobo in Support of Defendant Turo Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Injunction by Turo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sandridge, Hala)
May 23, 2019 Filing 69 AMENDED ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Verified Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Hillsborough County Aviation Authority by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #67 Turo's Unopposed Motion for Entry of Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Defendant Turo Inc. shall have up to and including May 23, 2019 to file amended affirmative defenses and counterclaims; Plaintiff shall have up to and including June 10, 2019 to respond to Defendant's amended affirmative defenses and counterclaims; and Defendant shall have up to and including June 27, 2019 to file its oppositions, if Plaintiff's response takes the form of motions rather than an answer. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/16/2019. (APF)
May 14, 2019 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Entry of Order Setting Briefing Schedule by Turo Inc. (Salazar, Richard)
May 10, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE canceling Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing scheduled for 5/17/2019. (KTT)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING #64 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Preliminary Injunction Evidence with Three Rebuttal Exhibits; CONTINUING preliminary injunction hearing. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/10/2019. (APF)
May 9, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION to supplement Preliminary Injunction Evidence with Three Rebuttal Exhibits by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Graham, Keith)
May 6, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Co-Counsel Appearance by Shannon Melissa Wiggins on behalf of Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Wiggins, Shannon)
May 3, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #31 Memorandum in opposition by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala)
May 3, 2019 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of Bethany Lobo re: #31 Memorandum in opposition by Turo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Sandridge, Hala)
May 3, 2019 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT of Varun Mathew re: #31 Memorandum in opposition by Turo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A, #2 Affidavit B)(Sandridge, Hala)
May 3, 2019 Filing 59 AFFIDAVIT of Michelle Peacock re: #31 Memorandum in opposition by Turo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sandridge, Hala)
May 3, 2019 Filing 58 AMENDED NOTICE of supplemental authority re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Graham, Keith)
May 3, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction per 4/22/19 Order by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Graham, Keith)
May 3, 2019 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT of Jeff Siddle re: #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Graham, Keith)
May 3, 2019 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT of John Hoffman re: #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Graham, Keith)
May 3, 2019 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT of Joel Feldman re: #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Graham, Keith)
May 2, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Strike #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Strike Defenses by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Graham, Keith)
May 2, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims with Prejudice by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Graham, Keith)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING #40 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File the Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff, The Hillsborough County Aviation Authority's Verified Motion for Temporary Injunction. The Court will direct the prevailing party to file a proposed order on the grounds found by the Court once that determination is made. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/25/2019. (APF)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #6 Plaintiff, The Hillsborough County Aviation Authority's Verified Motion for Temporary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2019 at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 7 A before Judge Mary S. Scriven. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/22/2019. (APF)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #48 Plaintiff, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Motions to Turo's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims. Plaintiff shall have up to and including May 2, 2019 to file its answer or otherwise respond to Turo's Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/18/2019. (APF)
April 18, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Graham, Keith)
April 17, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION for leave to file Proposed Order filed by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala)
April 16, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of compliance re 28 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc. (Smith, Amy)
April 16, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of compliance re 27 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc. (Lobo, Bethany)
April 16, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of compliance re 26 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc. (Kleine, Benjamin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of compliance re 24 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc. (Brown, Matthew)
April 16, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of compliance re 25 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc. (Rhodes, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Filing 41 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala)
April 15, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to file Proposed Order by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Graham, Keith)
April 15, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. Related case(s): no (Graham, Keith)
April 15, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority identifying Other Affiliate State Of Florida for Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Graham, Keith)
April 15, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Turo Inc. Related case(s): No (Sandridge, Hala)
April 15, 2019 Filing 36 DEMAND for trial by jury by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala)
April 8, 2019 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Jennifer Sam re #31 Memorandum in opposition by Turo Inc. (Salazar, Richard)
April 8, 2019 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Avinash Gangadharan re #31 Memorandum in opposition by Turo Inc. (Salazar, Richard)
April 8, 2019 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Michelle Fang re #31 Memorandum in opposition by Turo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Salazar, Richard)
April 8, 2019 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Matthew D. Brown re #31 Memorandum in opposition by Turo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Salazar, Richard)
April 8, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #6 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Turo Inc. (Salazar, Richard)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #29 Defendant Turo Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Response in Excess of Page Limit. Defendant's response shall not exceed twenty-five (25) pages in length, exclusive of cover pages, table of contents, and table of authorities. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/8/2019. (APF)
April 8, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Matthew D. Brown, appearing on behalf of Turo Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056007.) Related document: #19 Amended MOTION for Matthew D. Brown to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
April 8, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael G. Rhones, appearing on behalf of Turo Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056007.) Related document: #20 Amended MOTION for Michael G. Rhodes to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
April 8, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Benjamin H. Kleine, appearing on behalf of Turo Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056007.) Related document: #21 Amended MOTION for Benjamin H. Kleine to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
April 8, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Berhany C. Lobo, appearing on behalf of Turo Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056007.) Related document: #22 Amended MOTION for Bethany C. Lobo to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
April 8, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Amy M. Smith, appearing on behalf of Turo Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056007.) Related document: #23 Amended MOTION for Amy M. Smith to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
April 7, 2019 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Injunction by Turo Inc. (Salazar, Richard)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 amended motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Amy M. Smith may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Turo Inc., with Attorney Hala A. Sandridge designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/5/2019. (CKR)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 amended motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Bethany C. Lobo may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Turo Inc., with Attorney Hala A. Sandridge designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/5/2019. (CKR)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 amended motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Benjamin H. Kleine may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Turo Inc., with Attorney Hala A. Sandridge designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/5/2019. (CKR)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 amended motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Michael G. Rhodes may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Turo Inc., with Attorney Hala A. Sandridge designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/5/2019. (CKR)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 amended motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Matthew D. Brown may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Turo Inc., with Attorney Hala A. Sandridge designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/5/2019. (CKR)
April 5, 2019 Filing 23 Amended MOTION for Amy M. Smith to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 5, 2019 Filing 22 Amended MOTION for Bethany C. Lobo to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 5, 2019 Filing 21 Amended MOTION for Benjamin H. Kleine to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 Amended MOTION for Michael G. Rhodes to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 Amended MOTION for Matthew D. Brown to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #13 motion to appear pro hac vice; denying without prejudice #14 motion to appear pro hac vice; denying without prejudice #15 motion to appear pro hac vice; denying without prejudice #16 motion to appear pro hac vice; denying without prejudice #17 motion to appear pro hac vice. Motions fail to comply with Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires that the non-resident attorney be a member in good standing of the bar of any District Court of the United States, outside the State of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/4/2019. (CKR)
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Amy M. Smith to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Bethany C. Lobo to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc.(Sandridge, Hala) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Benjamin H. Kleine to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Matthew D. Brown to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Michael G. Rhodes to appear pro hac vice by Turo Inc.(Sandridge, Hala) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of service by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice . (Graham, Keith)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to Verified Mtn for Temporary Injunction by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority, Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit Index AND Exhibits 1-5_HCAA Supplement to Verified Mtn for Temp Inj, #3 Exhibit Index AND Exhibit 6_HCAA Supplement to Verified Mtn for Temp Inj, #4 Exhibit Index AND Exhibits 7-9_HCAA Supplement to Verified Mtn for Temp Inj)(Graham, Keith) Modified text on 5/3/2019 (LNR).
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02. (signed by deputy clerk). (LNR)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/16/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/2/2019. (KTT)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/16/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/2/2019. (KTT)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to supplement its Verified Motion for Temporary Injunction on or before 5:00 PM on April 3, 2019. (Dkt. 6) Defendants' deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Temporary Injunction is April 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/1/2019. (APF)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Turo Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Signature Pages to Notice of Removal and Certificate of Service. (Sandridge, Hala)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-774-T-35SPF. (SJB)
March 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for temporary injunction by Hillsborough County Aviation Authority. (Filed in state court on 3/25/19.) (LNR)
March 31, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Turo Inc. (Sandridge, Hala)
March 31, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Hillsborough County Aviation Authority by Turo Inc.(Sandridge, Hala)
March 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, Florida case number 19-CA-002677 filed in State Court on March 13, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15299752 filed by Turo Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Pending Motions, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sandridge, Hala)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillsborough County Aviation Authority v. Turo Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turo Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Kleine
Represented By: Michael G. Rhodes
Represented By: Matthew D. Brown
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: Bethany C. Lobo
Represented By: Hala A. Sandridge
Represented By: Benjamin H. Kleine
Represented By: Richard George Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillsborough County Aviation Authority
Represented By: Keith A. Graham
Represented By: Shannon Melissa Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?