Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 47.199.239.139

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 47.199.239.139
Case Number: 8:2019cv00782
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #2 Endorsed Order) (BES)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon due consideration of the #10 Notice of voluntary dismissal filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending deadlines/motions and close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/12/2019. (CCB)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Walker, Rachel)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Serve Third Party Subpoena in accord with the attached order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/6/2019. (CCB)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave to Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Legal Authority by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Greg Lansky, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Philip Pasquale, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit E Proposed Order)(Walker, Rachel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned pursuant to standing order in case 8:19-mc-41-T-23 to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-782-T-02CPT. Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed no longer assigned to the case. (Standing order attached for reference.) (KE)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/3/2019. (SAO)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BES)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-782-T-02JSS. (SJB)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): no (Walker, Rachel)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Walker, Rachel)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial - Injunctive Relief Sought against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 47.199.239.139 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15304849) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 47.199.239.139
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 47.199.239.139
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?