Graves v. Jim Browne Chevrolet, Inc.
Plaintiff: Raymond Graves
Defendant: Jim Browne Chevrolet, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00897
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. #23), this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Court declines to retain jurisdiction over this matter. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/3/2019. (DLB)
May 31, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Raymond Graves (Thorpe, Shaina)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #21), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/30/2019. (TWL)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2020 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the March 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Conduct mediation hearing by 10/7/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/30/2019. (DLB)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting the plaintiff's second unopposed motion for extension of time to file response/reply. (Doc. #19). The plaintiff's response is due by June 3, 2019. No further extensions to respond to the defendant's motion to dismiss will be granted. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/30/2019. (DLB)
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Count I and Count IV of Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) by Raymond Graves. (Thorpe, Shaina)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Thorpe, Shaina)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER: The parties were directed to file their completed Case Management Report by May 24, 2019. (Doc. # 11). A review of the docket reveals that no Report has been filed. Accordingly, the parties are again directed to file their completed Case Management Report by May 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/28/2019. (DLB)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting the plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to file response/reply. (Doc. #15). The plaintiff's response is due by May 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/23/2019. (DLB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Count I and Count IV of Plaintiff's Complaint by Raymond Graves. (Thorpe, Shaina)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jim Browne Chevrolet, Inc. Related case(s): no (Wages, Lauren)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Count I and Count IV of Plaintiff's Complaint by Jim Browne Chevrolet, Inc. (Wages, Lauren)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Wages on behalf of Jim Browne Chevrolet, Inc. (Wages, Lauren)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by May 24, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/26/2019. (DLB)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of service by Raymond Graves re #6 Summons issued . (Thorpe, Shaina)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Raymond Graves. Related case(s): No (Thorpe, Shaina)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/18/2019. (TWL)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/18/2019. (TWL)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Jim Browne Chevrolet, Inc. (BES)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Raymond Graves. (Thorpe, Shaina)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Raymond Graves. (Thorpe, Shaina) Modified on 4/17/2019 DOCUMENT TERMINATED, counsel to refile proposed summons (BES).
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-897-T-33JSS. (SJB)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Raymond Graves Civil Cover Sheet (Thorpe, Shaina)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jim Browne Chevrolet, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15357002) filed by Raymond Graves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Charge of Discrimination))(Thorpe, Shaina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graves v. Jim Browne Chevrolet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Browne Chevrolet, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Wages
Represented By: Anthony J. Petrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Graves
Represented By: Shaina Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?