C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. v. Phillips Produce, LLC et al
Plaintiff: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Defendant: Big Red Barn, LLC, Phillips Produce, LLC and Christopher Phillips
Case Number: 8:2019cv00916
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 6/12/2019 by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. as to Christopher Phillips. (Kyser, Eric)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 6/12/2019 by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. as to Big Red Barn, LLC. (Kyser, Eric)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 06/12/2019 by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. as to Phillips Produce, LLC. (Kyser, Eric)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Kyser, Eric)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, #8 Supplement Exhibit D to Complaint by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Kyser, Eric)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 *** Counsel notified to re-file with the proper cover sheet indicating style of the case and case number **** SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Exhibit D to Complaint by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.(Kyser, Eric) Modified punctuation and text and NEF regenerated on 5/16/2019 (KMM).
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of compliance re 6 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.. (Kyser, Eric)
April 24, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Ted W. Weeks IV (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056309.) Related document: #2 MOTION for Eric M. Kyser to appear pro hac vice. (ARC) Modified on 4/24/2019 (ARC).
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Eric M. Kyser may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Ted W. Weeks, IV, designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/23/2019. (CKR)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/22/2019. (SAO)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Big Red Barn, LLC, Christopher Phillips, Phillips Produce, LLC. (KMM)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-916-T-02SPF. (SJB)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Eric M. Kyser to appear pro hac vice by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A # 2 Supplement ***REMOVED NOT TO BE FILED ON CM/ECF *** )(Weeks, Theodore) Modified text and image on 4/18/2019 (KMM).
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Phillips Produce, LLC , Big Red Barn, LLC , Christopher Phillips (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15366179) filed by C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons on Big Red Barn, LLC, #6 Proposed Summons on Phillips Produce, LLC, #7 Proposed Summons on Christopher Phillips)(Weeks, Theodore) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (KMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. v. Phillips Produce, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Red Barn, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips Produce, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Kyser
Represented By: Theodore Willard Weeks, IV
Represented By: Eric M. Kyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?