Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Karl of Pasco, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Carl Perkins Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, Arc/Conrad Music LLC, Rondor Music International, Inc., Jay-Boy Music Corp., Hydroponic Music, Estate of Maurice Ernest Gibb and the Estate of Robin Gibb, Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Embassy Music Corporation, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Big Bang Music and Beechwood Music Corporation
Defendant: Karl of Pasco, Inc., The Reef, Joseph Karl, Jr. and Karl Reef Bar
Case Number: 8:2019cv00955
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: James D Whittemore
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 5/21/2019. (SMA)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Arc/Conrad Music LLC, Beechwood Music Corporation, Big Bang Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Carl Perkins Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, Embassy Music Corporation, Estate of Maurice Ernest Gibb and the Estate of Robin Gibb, Hydroponic Music, Jay-Boy Music Corp., Rondor Music International, Inc., Sugarfuzz Music, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Messa, Zachary)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (LSS)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Joseph Karl, Jr, Karl of Pasco, Inc. (LSS)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (CAB)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James D. Whittemore and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-955-T-27AAS. (SJB)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15380028) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons Karl of Pasco, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons Summons Joseph Karl, Jr.)(Messa, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Karl of Pasco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl of Pasco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Reef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Karl, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Reef Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Perkins Music, Inc.
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crompton Songs
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arc/Conrad Music LLC
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay-Boy Music Corp.
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hydroponic Music
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Maurice Ernest Gibb and the Estate of Robin Gibb
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sugarfuzz Music, Inc.
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Embassy Music Corporation
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Bang Music
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beechwood Music Corporation
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Zachary David Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?