Langlois et al v. Morse
Plaintiff: Margetta Langlois and Ralph Cafaro, Jr.
Defendant: Ted Morse
Case Number: 8:2019cv01024
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #11 Motion to extend time. Plaintiffs seek an extension of time to pay the court filing fee, but state the extension is "needed if denied indigent again to file suit [in] forma-pauperis." (internal quotations omitted). Plaintiffs have not filed (and the Court has not denied) a renewed request to proceed in forma pauperis. Therefore, Plaintiff's request is premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/22/2019. (Flynn, Sean)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to extend time to pay filing fee by Ralph Cafaro, Jr., Margetta Langlois. (KMM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; adopting #5 Report and Recommendations; denying as moot #9 Motion for Reconsideration; denying without prejudice #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint and a renewed request to proceed in forma pauperis on or before 7/12/2019 consistent with the attached order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/14/2019. (CCB)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency filed by Ralph Cafaro, Jr., #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency filed by Margetta Langlois. by Ralph Cafaro, Jr., Margetta Langlois. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JCG)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Ralph Cafaro, Jr., Margetta Langlois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JCG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2019: #2 Mailing Envelope) (JCG).
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ralph Cafaro, Jr., Margetta Langlois. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JCG)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ralph Cafaro, Jr., Margetta Langlois. (JCG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2019: #1 Mailing Envelope) (JCG).
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency filed by Ralph Cafaro, Jr., #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency filed by Margetta Langlois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/2/2019. (CKR)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/1/2019. (SAO)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Ralph Cafaro, Jr.. (KMM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Margetta Langlois. (KMM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ted Morse filed by Margetta Langlois, Ralph Cafaro, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langlois et al v. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margetta Langlois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Cafaro, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?