United States of America v. One 2017 Lamborghini Huracan, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America, Department of Justice and United States of America
Defendant: One 2017 Porsche Cayenne and One 2017 Lamborghini Huracan
Claimant: Jenny Lizeth Ambuila-Chara
Case Number: 8:2019cv01060
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of compliance re #7 Order Jointly regarding Case Management Report by Jenny Lizeth Ambuila-Chara, United States of America (Palazzo, Joseph)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Verified Complaint for Forfeiture Based on Improper Venue and Based on the Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens, MOTION for Hearing re #1 Complaint by Jenny Lizeth Ambuila-Chara, One 2017 Lamborghini Huracan, One 2017 Porsche Cayenne. (Vila, George)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by United States of America re #11 Claim Plaintiff's Intent to Propound Special Interrogatories (Palazzo, Joseph)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 CLAIM Verified Claim by Jenny Lizeth Ambuila-Chara. (Vila, George)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of compliance re #7 Order and Compliance with Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America (Palazzo, Joseph)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance Appearance by George J. Vila on behalf of One 2017 Lamborghini Huracan, One 2017 Porsche Cayenne (Vila, George)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America re #6 Notice of designation of track Plaintiff's Consent (Palazzo, Joseph)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/9/2019. (GSO)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 the United States of America's Application for Warrant for Arrest in Rem. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a warrant of arrest in rem for the defendant vehicles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 5/6/2019. (JAR)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-1060-T-23JSS. (SJB)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America, Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Arrest Warrant In Rem)(Palazzo, Joseph)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against All Parties filed by United States of America, Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Palazzo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 2017 Lamborghini Huracan, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, Department of Justice
Represented By: Joseph Palazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Joseph Palazzo
Represented By: James D. Mandolfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2017 Porsche Cayenne
Represented By: George J. Vila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2017 Lamborghini Huracan
Represented By: George J. Vila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jenny Lizeth Ambuila-Chara
Represented By: George J. Vila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?