Taylor Media Corp v. Fluent, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Media Corp
Defendant: Sea of Savings LLC, Sea of Savings, Fluent, Inc. and Fluent, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01174
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER denying #18 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/10/2019. (Jung, William)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER denying #16 motion to dismiss. The complaint well satisfies a notice pleading standard. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/10/2019. (Jung, William)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/9/2019. (CCB)
July 8, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Taylor Media Corp. (Coleman, Laura)
June 25, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint filed by Taylor Media Corp. (Lieser, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Fluent, Inc., Fluent, LLC, Sea of Savings LLC. Related case(s): yes (Jakes, Frank)
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Fluent, Inc., Fluent, LLC, Sea of Savings LLC. (Jakes, Frank)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Response due by 7/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/20/2019. (Flynn, Sean)
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Taylor Media Corp. (Lieser, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
June 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED HEARING (at request of counsel) on #16 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint , #18 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint set for 8/19/2019 at 1:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. (one hour reserved)(CCB)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of HEARING on #16 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint , #18 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint set for 7/9/2019 at 1:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. (one hour reserved)(CCB)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint by Fluent, Inc., Fluent, LLC, Sea of Savings LLC. (Jakes, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST for oral argument re #16 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Fluent, Inc., Fluent, LLC, Sea of Savings LLC. (Jakes, Frank)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Fluent, Inc., Fluent, LLC, Sea of Savings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 9A, #3 Exhibit 9B, #4 Exhibit 9C, #5 Exhibit 9D, #6 Exhibit 10A, #7 Exhibit 10B, #8 Exhibit 11A, #9 Exhibit 11B, #10 Exhibit 12A, #11 Exhibit 12B, #12 Exhibit 13A, #13 Exhibit 13B, #14 Exhibit 13C, #15 Exhibit 14A, #16 Exhibit 14B, #17 Exhibit 14C, #18 Exhibit 15A, #19 Exhibit 15B, #20 Exhibit 15C, #21 Exhibit 16A, #22 Exhibit 16B, #23 Exhibit 16C, #24 Exhibit 17A, #25 Exhibit 17B, #26 Exhibit 17C, #27 Exhibit 18A, #28 Exhibit 18B, #29 Exhibit 19A, #30 Exhibit 19B, #31 Exhibit 19C, #32 Exhibit 20A, #33 Exhibit 20B, #34 Exhibit 20C, #35 Exhibit 21A, #36 Exhibit 21B, #37 Exhibit 21C)(Jakes, Frank)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint. Response due by 6/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/5/2019. (Flynn, Sean)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Jakes, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 05/17/2019 by Taylor Media Corp as to Fluent, Inc. (Lieser, Jeffrey) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (JCG).
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 05/17/2019 by Taylor Media Corp as to Fluent, LLC. (Lieser, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 05/17/2019 by Taylor Media Corp as to Sea of Savings LLC. (Lieser, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Taylor Media Corp identifying Corporate Parent Taylor Media Corp., Other Affiliate thepennyhoarder.com, Other Affiliate pennyrewards.com, Other Affiliate The Penny Hoarder, Other Affiliate Taylor Media for Taylor Media Corp. (Lieser, Jeffrey) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (JCG).
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Taylor Media Corp. Related case(s): Yes (Lieser, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/31/2019. (CCB)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Weissman on behalf of Fluent, Inc., Fluent, LLC, Sea of Savings LLC (Weissman, Joseph)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Defendants. (Jakes, Frank)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/20/2019. (SAO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-10, #3 Exhibit 11-22, #4 Exhibit 23a, #5 Exhibit 23b, #6 Exhibit 24-25) (BES)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Fluent, Inc., Fluent, LLC, Sea of Savings LLC. (BES)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-1174-T-02SPF. (AG)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fluent, Inc., Fluent, LLC, Sea of Savings LLC with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA 56559 filed by Taylor Media Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-10, #3 Exhibit 11-22, #4 Exhibit 23a, #5 Exhibit 23b, #6 Exhibit 24-25)(BES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor Media Corp v. Fluent, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea of Savings LLC
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Joseph J. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea of Savings
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Joseph J. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluent, Inc.
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Joseph J. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluent, LLC
Represented By: Frank R. Jakes
Represented By: Joseph J. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Media Corp
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Lieser
Represented By: Laura Mauldin Coleman
Represented By: Woodrow Heath Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?