Schauer v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Schauer
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc. and Nissan Motor Company, LTD.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01224
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/13/2020; Dispositive motions due by 4/24/2020; Pretrial Conference set for TUESDAY, DECEMBER 1, 2020, at 9:45 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Jury Trial set for the JANUARY 2021 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (SMB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hosley, Frank)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co. Ltd for Nissan North America, Inc. (Hosley, Frank) Modified text on 6/3/2019 (BSN).
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Richard Schauer. Related case(s): no (Knopf, Andrew)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Richard Schauer. (Knopf, Andrew)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nissan North America, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Hosley, Frank)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing civil cover sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by Nissan Motor Company, LTD., Nissan North America, Inc. (Shepard, Katherine) Modified text on 5/24/2019 (BSN).
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 5/21/2019. (KAC)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Nissan North America, Inc.(Hosley, Frank) Modified text on 5/21/2019 (BSN).
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-1224-T-30AAS. (SJB)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Manatee Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-1564 filed in State Court on 04/05/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15479860 filed by Nissan North America, Inc., Nissan Motor Company, LTD., Richard Schauer. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hosley, Frank) COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO FILE FEDERAL COURT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Modified on 5/21/2019 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schauer v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Frank D. Hosley
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Company, LTD.
Represented By: Frank D. Hosley
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Schauer
Represented By: Frank D. Hosley
Represented By: Andrew F. Knopf
Represented By: Mitchell Houston Chubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?