Cedeno v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Amarylis Cedeno
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2019cv01233
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. United States of America answer or response due 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/18/2019. (Wilson, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by United States of America. (Kenneth, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Modified event type on 7/16/2019 (CTR).
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 05/22/2019 by Amarylis Cedeno as to United States of America. (Gordon, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Amarylis Cedeno. (Gordon, Jeffrey)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (CTR)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/20/2019. (BGS)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/20/2019. (BGS)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to United States of America.(CTR)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA056636 filed by Amarylis Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cedeno v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarylis Cedeno
Represented By: Adam J. Fernandez
Represented By: Jeffrey Jack Gordon
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Kenneth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?