Zafirov v. Florida Medical Associates, LLC et al
Case Number: 8:2019cv01236
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER denying 306 Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order; denying 309 Joinder in Defendants' Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/28/2024. (CED)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 280 Motion to Compel Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production No. 11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/27/2024. (CED)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 184 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/5/2024. (CED)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER denying 255 Time-Sensitive Motion for Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/22/2024. (CED)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER denying 164 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 2/27/2024. (CED)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 143 Motion to Compel. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 11/29/2023. (CED)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying 97 Motion to Dismiss; denying 98 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/12/2022. (RLD)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 41 50 51 Motions to Dismiss. By 10/22/2021, Zafirov may file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 9/28/2021. (JMB)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 43 and 52 motions to stay discovery. Discovery is stayed pending an order on the defendants' motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 6/11/2021. (DMP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zafirov v. Florida Medical Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?