Swagart v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC

Plaintiff: richard swagart, Estate Kimberly Swagart and Richard S. Swagart
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01248
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/1/2020; Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2020; Pretrial Conference set for TUESDAY, NOVEMBER 10, 2020 at 11:15 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Jury Trial set for the DECEMBER 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/18/2019. (KAC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Colvin, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lowe's Home Centers LLC.(Blain, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Richard S. Swagart. Related case(s): No (Colvin, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Related case(s): No (Blain, Christopher)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 5/22/2019. (SMB)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-1248-T-30CPT. (SJB)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sarasota County Court, case number 2019-CA-2147 filed in State Court on 04/18/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15487652 filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blain, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2019: #3 State Court COMPLAINT, #4 exhibit to state court Complaint) (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swagart v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: richard swagart
Represented By: John V. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate Kimberly Swagart
Represented By: John V. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard S. Swagart
Represented By: John V. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Christopher Blain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?