Nicopure Labs, LLC v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Nicopure Labs, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 8:2019cv01354
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER referring the motion for default judgment and permanent injunction (Doc. #14) to the Honorable Amanda Arnold Sansone, United States Magistrate Judge, for the issuance of a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/12/2019. (DMD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for default judgment against John Doe (and permanent injunction) by Nicopure Labs, LLC. (Richter, Mindi)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to John Doe (KMM)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against John Doe d/b/a Halo CBD USA by Nicopure Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(Richter, Mindi) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: On June 5, 2019, Nicopure Labs served Defendant. (Doc. #6). Therefore, Defendant's answer to the complaint was due on June 26, 2019. But no answer has been filed and Nicopure Labs has not promptly applied to the Clerk for entry of default pursuant to Local Rule 1.07(b). Accordingly, Nicopure Labs is directed to show cause by July 5, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 3.10(a). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/28/2019. (DMD)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nicopure Labs, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Richter, Mindi)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice by Nicopure Labs, LLC. (Richter, Mindi)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/14/2019. (TWL)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by July 10, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/11/2019. (DMD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 6/5/19 by Nicopure Labs, LLC as to John Doe. (Richter, Mindi)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele Leo Hintson on behalf of Nicopure Labs, LLC (Hintson, Michele)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (JCG)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to John Doe. (JCG)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-1354-T-33AAS. (SJB)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial, Injunctive Relief Sought against John Doe d/b/a Halo CBD USA with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15537589) filed by Nicopure Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Proposed Summons)(Richter, Mindi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicopure Labs, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicopure Labs, LLC
Represented By: Mindi M. Richter
Represented By: John Todd Timmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Fabian
Represented By: Michele Leo Hintson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?