Roundabout Watercrafts, LLC v. Ultraskiff, LLC

Plaintiff: Roundabout Watercrafts, LLC
Defendant: Ultraskiff, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01366
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by September 20, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report for patent cases. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/16/2019. (DMD)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 7/15/19 by Roundabout Watercrafts, LLC as to Ultraskiff, LLC. (Adams, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS report Plaintiff's Status Report to Perfect Service of Process on Defendant by Roundabout Watercrafts, LLC. (Adams, David)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on its efforts to perfect service of process on Defendant by July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/8/2019. (DMD)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roundabout Watercrafts, LLC. Related case(s): No (Adams, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Ultraskiff, LLC. (BES)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Roundabout Watercrafts, LLC. (Adams, David)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/17/2019. (TWL)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/14/2019. (TWL)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing civil cover sheet by Roundabout Watercrafts, LLC re #1 Complaint Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adams, David) Modified text on 6/7/2019 (JCG).
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Copy of complaint with exhibits) (AG)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ultraskiff, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA056802 filed by Roundabout Watercrafts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(AG) Modified on 6/6/2019 (AG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roundabout Watercrafts, LLC v. Ultraskiff, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultraskiff, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roundabout Watercrafts, LLC
Represented By: David W. Adams
Represented By: Zachary J. Glaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?