Nicopure Labs, LLC v. Midwest Goods Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicopure Labs, LLC
Defendant: Midwest Goods Inc., Mudassir Yasin, Kamran Yasin and Midwest Goods Distribution Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01373
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Nicopure Labs, LLC. (Richter, Mindi)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nicopure Labs, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Richter, Mindi)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/7/2019. (BGS)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/7/2019. (BGS)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Civil Cover Sheet) (DG)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Midwest Goods Distribution Inc., Midwest Goods Inc., Kamran Yasin, Mudassir Yasin. (DG)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-1373-T-36AAS. (SJB)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial, Injunctive Relief Sought against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15544914) filed by Nicopure Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Proposed Summons, #18 Proposed Summons, #19 Proposed Summons, #20 Proposed Summons)(Richter, Mindi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicopure Labs, LLC v. Midwest Goods Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicopure Labs, LLC
Represented By: Mindi M. Richter
Represented By: John Todd Timmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Fabian
Represented By: Michele Leo Hintson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Goods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mudassir Yasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamran Yasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Goods Distribution Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?